Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025516

EP2025516 - Printing Machine with Linear Driving Means [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.2011
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.10.2011  [2011/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valentini, Maria Grazia
Via dei Prati, 12
37012 Bussolengo (Verona) / IT
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Maggio, Claudio
Via dei Prati, 12
37012, Bussolengo (Verona) / IT
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l.
Patents
Piazza Bra, 28
37121 Verona / IT
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28
37121 Verona / IT
Former [2009/08]Reniero, Cirillo Silvano
c/o Dr.Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Via D. Manin, 5
37122 Verona / IT
Application number, filing date08170667.308.09.2005
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateIT2004VR0014110.09.2004         Original published format: IT VR20040141
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025516
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2025516
Date:19.08.2009
[2009/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:B41F13/38, B41F13/30
[2009/34]
Former International [2009/08]B41F27/10
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/28]
Former [2010/17]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Träger- und lösbare Haltevorrichtung für eine Nabe eines Druckzylinders[2009/08]
English:Printing Machine with Linear Driving Means[2009/08]
French:Dispositif de support et de fixation amovible pour un moyeu d'un cylindre d'impression[2009/08]
Examination procedure04.06.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/28]
31.03.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/40]
18.05.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/40]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05019547.8  / EP1634701
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050019547) is  16.02.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
04.06.2010Request for further processing filed
04.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
04.06.2010Request for further processing filed
04.06.2010Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
04.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
10.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200905   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2010
30.09.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0955161  (UTECO S P A ROTO FLEXO & CONVE [IT]) [Y] 1 * paragraphs [0013] - [0023] *;
 [Y]US5819656  (GERTSCH PETER [CH], et al) [Y] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 45 *;
 [A]US5906162  (KOLBE WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 14 *;
 [A]US5669302  (ROGGE GUENTER [DE], et al) [A] 5-18 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 12 *;
 [AD]EP1199167  (BUFFO FLAVIO [IT])
by applicantEP1199167
 ES2127658