Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2065314

EP2065314 - Closure [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.08.2010
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.08.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 22.09.2010  [2010/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Creanova Universal Closures Ltd.
5 Shannon Point Oakfield Close, Tewkesbury Business Park Tewkesbury
GL20 8PF / GB
[2009/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Druitt, Rodney
36 A The Broadwalk Imperial Square
Cheltenham, GL5O 1QG / GB
 [2009/23]
Representative(s)Rentsch Partner AG
Bellerivestrasse 203
Postfach
8034 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Rentsch & Partner
Rechtsanwälte und Patentanwälte Fraumünsterstrasse 9
8022 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date08171115.208.04.2005
[2009/23]
Priority number, dateUS20040606240P01.09.2004         Original published format: US 606240 P
[2009/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2065314
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
[2009/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2065314
Date:16.09.2009
[2009/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.08.2009
ClassificationInternational:B65D41/04
[2009/23]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/23]
TitleGerman:Verschluss[2009/23]
English:Closure[2009/23]
French:Fermeture[2009/23]
Examination procedure09.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
17.03.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/38]
04.05.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/38]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP05747178.1  / EP1799573
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.2009Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201006   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO8912584  (MK PLASTICS PTY LTD [AU], et al) [X] 1-6,17-20 * page 4, line 9 - page 6, line 24; figures 1,2 * [Y] 8,11,12;
 [X]US4598835  (BROWNBILL THOMAS D [GB]) [X] 1-7,17-20 * column 2, line 10 - column 4, line 40; figure 2 *;
 [X]US2002158037  (KANO YUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,17-20 * paragraphs [0029] - [0045]; figures 2-10 *;
 [X]US5782369  (TANSEY CHARLES MARTIN [AU]) [X] 1-7,9,10,17-20 * column 6, line 47 - column 8, line 64; figures 1-4 *;
 [X]US2001027957  (KANO YUJI [JP]) [X] 1-7,17-20 * paragraphs [0032] - [0041]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]DE3139526  (OBRIST AG ALBERT [CH]) [Y] 8 * page 15, lines 1-16; figure 5 *;
 [X]DE3842443  (BAREIN NORBERT [DE]) [X] 16 * column 13, lines 53-68; figures 1-12 *;
 [X]EP0987190  (CROWN CORK & SEAL TECH CORP [US]) [X] 16 * paragraph [0027] *;
 [X]US6769575  (LONG JR CHARLES J [US]) [X] 14,15 * column 5, lines 12-52; figures 1,1A *;
 [Y]US4560077  (DUTT HERBERT V [US]) [Y] 11,12 * column 6, lines 8-39; figure 1 *
by applicantGB788148
 AU1545676
 AU1418083
 US6695161
 US5423444
 EP0076778
 EP0093690
 US4489845
 US4907709
 US6634060