Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2149378

EP2149378 - Topical formulations for the symptomatic treatment of musculoskeletal disorders [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.06.2015
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Velleja Research SRL
Via Natta, 28
29010 Pontenure (PC) / IT
[2014/30]
Former [2010/05]For all designated states
Velleja Research SRL
Corso Italia 1
20122 Milano / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Di Pierro, Francesco
c/o VELLEJA RESEARCH S.r.l.
Via G. Natta, 28
29010, PONTENURE (PC) / IT
 [2014/32]
Former [2010/05]01 / Di Pierro, Francesco
c/o VELLEJA RESEARCH S.r.l. Via G. Natta, 28
29010, PONTENURE (PC) / IT
Representative(s)Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l.
Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63
20129 Milano / IT
Former [2010/05]Minoja, Fabrizio
Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio 63
20129 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08171353.911.12.2008
[2010/05]
Priority number, dateIT2008MI0140429.07.2008         Original published format: IT MI20081404
[2010/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2149378
Date:03.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2149378
Date:06.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.05.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61K36/324, A61K36/81, A61K36/77, A61P19/00
[2010/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/05]
TitleGerman:Topische Formulierungen für die symptomatische Behandlung von Skelettmuskelkrankheiten[2010/05]
English:Topical formulations for the symptomatic treatment of musculoskeletal disorders[2010/05]
French:Formulations topiques pour le traitement symptomatiques de troubles musculo-squelettiques[2010/05]
Examination procedure14.04.2010Observations by third parties
22.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/35]
22.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.01.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2014Fee for grant paid
24.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.06.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.07.2013
Opposition(s)07.05.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.12.2008
AT06.08.2014
BE06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
MT06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU11.12.2008
AT06.08.2014
BE06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
TR06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2016/27]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
MC06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/50]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SI06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
FR31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/48]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
GB11.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/47]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
Former [2015/46]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
IE11.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/35]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
LU11.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/30]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
Former [2015/23]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
CZ06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
EE06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
SK06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/22]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
DK06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
RO06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT06.08.2014
CY06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
HR06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
LV06.08.2014
NL06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
IS06.12.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY06.08.2014
ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
PL06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
GR07.11.2014
PT09.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES06.08.2014
FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
BG06.11.2014
NO06.11.2014
Former [2015/09]FI06.08.2014
LT06.08.2014
SE06.08.2014
Former [2015/08]LT06.08.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]  - LONG L ET AL, "Herbal medicines for the treatment of osteoarthritis: A systematic review", RHEUMATOLOGY, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20010701), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 1462-0324, pages 779 - 793, XP009106094 [Y] 1-10 * page 780 - page 781; table 4 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/40.7.779
 [Y]  - MELETIS C D ET AL, "RHEUMATOID ARTHRITIS ETIOLOGY AND NATUROPATHIC TREATMENTS", ALTERNATIVE AND COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES, MARY ANN LIEBERT, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (20011201), vol. 7, no. 6, ISSN 1076-2809, pages 347 - 354, XP001126222 [Y] 1-10 * page 352, column L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10762800152709697
 [Y]  - MENVIELLE-BOURG F J, "Plants and ageing, recent data. PLANTES ET VIEILLISSEMENT, DONNEES ACTUELLES", PHYTOTHÉRAPIE, SPRINGER-VERLAG, PARIS, FR, (20050101), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1624-8597, pages 57 - 71, XP002407507 [Y] 1-10 * page 66 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10298-005-0070-5
 [Y]  - GUILLEMIN R ET AL, [Trial use of aescine by drug dielectrolysis--apropos of 80 cases], ELECTRODIAGNOSTIC-THÉRAPIE 1977, VOL. 14, NR. 2, PAGE(S) 51 - 54, (1977), ISSN 0424-8120, XP009115978 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - CLAYTON J J, "Nutraceuticals in the management of osteoarthritis", ORTHOPEDICS, THOROFARE, NJ, US, (20070801), vol. 30, no. 8, ISSN 0147-7447, pages 624 - 629, XP009115930 [Y] 1-10 * page 625, column R *
 [Y]  - STYCZYNSKI T, "Degenerative stenosis of lumbar spinal canal with neurogenic claudication. Pathomechanism of development of clinical symptoms and therapeutical implications", REUMATOLOGIA (WARSAW),, (20040101), vol. 42, no. 1, pages 59 - 63, XP002525357 [Y] 1-10 * page 63, column 1 *