Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026189

EP2026189 - Storage system that transfers system information elements [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Hitachi, Ltd.
6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8280 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ueno, Koichi, c/o Hitachi Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 8220 / JP
02 / Nagata, Koji, c/o Hitachi Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 8220 / JP
03 / Nonaka, Yusuke, c/o Hitachi Ltd.
Intellectual Property Group 6-1 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-8220 / JP
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Moore, Graeme Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/23]Moore, Graeme Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London
EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2009/08]Hodsdon, Stephen James , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date08250226.117.01.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateJP2007019814030.07.2007         Original published format: JP 2007198140
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2026189
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/06
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE [2009/43]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Speichersystem zur Übertragung von Systemdatenelementen[2009/08]
English:Storage system that transfers system information elements[2009/08]
French:Système de stockage qui transfert des éléments d'informations de système[2009/08]
Examination procedure06.02.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
19.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
24.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2010/07]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1577748  (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0064] * * paragraphs [0097] , [0098] * * paragraph [0102] - paragraph [0176] * * figure 17 *;
 [Y]US2003159058  (EGUCHI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0097] * * figures 2,12 *;
 [Y]US2003229764  (OHNO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0040] *
by applicantJP2007198140
 JP2004102374