Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1951007

EP1951007 - Consumable component parts for a plasma torch [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.07.2011
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2017Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hypertherm, Inc.
Etna Road
P.O. Box 5010
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
[2012/01]
Former [2008/31]For all designated states
HYPERTHERM, INC.
Etna Road P.O. Box 5010
Hanover, NH 03755 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Lindsay, Jon W.
Meadowbrook Village Bldg. 2, Apt. 8
West Lebanon NH 03784 / US
02 / Bartlett, Brent R.
1147 Wrights Mountain Road
Bradford VT 05033 / US
03 / Brandt, Aaron D.
PO Box 620
Grantham, NH 03753 / US
04 / Duan, Zheng
15 Carriage Lane
Hanover NH 03755 / US
05 / Liebold, Stephen M.
P.O. Box 1688
Grantham NH 03753 / US
 [2008/31]
Representative(s)Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Frühlingstrasse 43A
45133 Essen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/31]Trueman, Lucy Petra
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date08250275.822.01.2008
[2008/31]
Priority number, dateUS2007062619123.01.2007         Original published format: US 626191
[2008/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1951007
Date:30.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1951007
Date:24.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:H05H1/34
[2008/31]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/31]
TitleGerman:Verschleißteile für einen Plasmabrenner[2008/31]
English:Consumable component parts for a plasma torch[2008/31]
French:Parties de composants consommables pour torche à plasma[2011/10]
Former [2008/31]Parties de composant consommable pour torche à plasma
Examination procedure15.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/31]
08.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.02.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2011Fee for grant paid
21.06.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11150336.3  / EP2339898
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  15.09.2011  21.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A.
Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle
75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
 [N/P]
Former [2011/43]
Opponent(s)01  15.09.2011  21.09.2011  ADMISSIBLE
L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE
75, Quai d'Orsay
75007 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Pittis, Olivier
L'Air Liquide, S.A., Direction de la Propriété Intellectuelle, 75, Quai d'Orsay
75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR
10.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.01.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
25.01.2013Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2013Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
30.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
17.10.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
17.10.2014Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition16.12.2014Appeal received No.  T2327/14
27.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
06.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.01.2008
AT24.08.2011
BE24.08.2011
CY24.08.2011
DK24.08.2011
EE24.08.2011
FI24.08.2011
HR24.08.2011
LT24.08.2011
LV24.08.2011
MT24.08.2011
NL24.08.2011
PL24.08.2011
RO24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
SI24.08.2011
SK24.08.2011
TR24.08.2011
BG24.11.2011
NO24.11.2011
GR25.11.2011
ES05.12.2011
IS24.12.2011
PT26.12.2011
GB22.01.2012
IE22.01.2012
LU22.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
FR31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT24.08.2011
BE24.08.2011
CY24.08.2011
DK24.08.2011
EE24.08.2011
FI24.08.2011
HR24.08.2011
LT24.08.2011
LV24.08.2011
MT24.08.2011
NL24.08.2011
PL24.08.2011
RO24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
SI24.08.2011
SK24.08.2011
TR24.08.2011
BG24.11.2011
NO24.11.2011
GR25.11.2011
ES05.12.2011
IS24.12.2011
PT26.12.2011
GB22.01.2012
IE22.01.2012
LU22.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
FR31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2014/21]AT24.08.2011
BE24.08.2011
CY24.08.2011
DK24.08.2011
EE24.08.2011
FI24.08.2011
HR24.08.2011
LT24.08.2011
LV24.08.2011
MT24.08.2011
NL24.08.2011
PL24.08.2011
RO24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
SI24.08.2011
SK24.08.2011
TR24.08.2011
BG24.11.2011
NO24.11.2011
GR25.11.2011
ES05.12.2011
IS24.12.2011
PT26.12.2011
GB22.01.2012
IE22.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
FR31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/35]AT24.08.2011
BE24.08.2011
CY24.08.2011
DK24.08.2011
EE24.08.2011
FI24.08.2011
HR24.08.2011
LT24.08.2011
LV24.08.2011
MT24.08.2011
NL24.08.2011
PL24.08.2011
RO24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
SI24.08.2011
SK24.08.2011
BG24.11.2011
NO24.11.2011
GR25.11.2011
ES05.12.2011
IS24.12.2011
PT26.12.2011
GB22.01.2012
IE22.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
FR31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT24.08.2011
BE24.08.2011
CY24.08.2011
DK24.08.2011
EE24.08.2011
FI24.08.2011
HR24.08.2011
LT24.08.2011
LV24.08.2011
NL24.08.2011
PL24.08.2011
RO24.08.2011
SE24.08.2011
SI24.08.2011
SK24.08.2011
BG24.11.2011
NO24.11.2011
GR25.11.2011
ES05.12.2011
IS24.12.2011
PT26.12.2011
GB22.01.2012
IE22.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
FR31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004200810  (BRANDT AARON D [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-11,17-20,22-27,29-31 * paragraph [0065]; figure 11 *;
 [X]WO0213583  (HYPERTHERM INC [US]) [X] 1,2,4-7,9-11,16,17,19-25 * page 1, line 5 - line 12 * * page 4, line 4 - line 10 * * page 6, line 6 - line 10 * * page 11, line 4 - page 12, line 5 * * page 15, line 11 - line 17 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US6979796  (HARDWICK STEVEN F [US]) [A] 1-8,10-12,18,19,23,24,26-31 * column 2, line 1 - line 65 * * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 32 * * figures 1,5 *;
 [A]US5841095  (LU ZHIPENG [US], et al) [A] 13 * column 6, line 35 - line 66 * * figure 2 *
by applicantUS2004200810