Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1965204

EP1965204 - Gas sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  03.08.2013
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
06.09.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NGK Insulators, Ltd.
2-56, Suda-cho Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-city, Aichi 467-8530 / JP
[2008/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Suzuki, Yoshio
c/o Legal Affairs and Intellectual Property Dept., NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP
02 / Tagawa, Kouji
c/o Legal Affairs and Intellectual Property Dept., NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP
03 / Nakagaki, Kunihiko
c/o Legal Affairs and Intellectual Property Dept., NGK Insulators, Ltd., 2-56 Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya City, Aichi-ken 467-8530 / JP
 [2008/36]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/36]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date08250632.025.02.2008
[2008/36]
Priority number, dateJP2007004740827.02.2007         Original published format: JP 2007047408
[2008/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1965204
Date:03.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/407
[2008/36]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2009/19]
Former [2008/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gassensor[2008/36]
English:Gas sensor[2008/36]
French:Capteur de gaz[2008/36]
Examination procedure14.03.2008Examination requested  [2008/36]
04.03.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
09.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.04.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
17.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
15.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination25.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1550/17
23.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.03.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
20.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
24.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
24.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
24.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
14.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
13.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[XD]US5144249  (KURISHITA AKIYOSHI [JP], et al) [XD] 1-4 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 14; figures 3(a),1 *;
 [X]US6645360  (EISELE ULRICH [DE], et al) [X] 1-4 * column 2, line 46 - column 3, line 67; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2004158971  (KAWASHIMA YUKIO [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0088]; figure 1 *
by applicantJPS58153155
 JPS6197562
 JP2786507B