Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028566

EP2028566 - Fixing device, image forming apparatus including the fixing device, and fixing method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2012
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.10.2012  [2012/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku
Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Miyahara, Akiko
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
02 / Ishii, Kenji
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
03 / Ogawa, Tadashi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
04 / Ueno, Satoshi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
05 / Seo, Hiroshi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd.
3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
 [2011/45]
Former [2009/09]01 / Miyahara, Akiko
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
02 / Ishii, Kenji
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
03 / Ogawa, Tadashi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
04 / Ueno, Satoshi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
05 / Seo, Hiroshi
c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6 Nakamagome 1-chome
Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP
Representative(s)Leeming, John Gerard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/45]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2009/09]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08250702.129.02.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateJP2007005652307.03.2007         Original published format: JP 2007056523
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028566
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028566
Date:02.06.2010
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028566
Date:09.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:G03G15/20
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2011/06]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Fixiervorrichtung, Bilderzeugungsvorrichtung mit der Fixiervorrichtung und Fixierverfahren[2009/09]
English:Fixing device, image forming apparatus including the fixing device, and fixing method[2009/09]
French:Dispositif de fixation, appareil de formation d'image incluant le dispositif de fixation et procédé de fixation[2009/09]
Examination procedure18.10.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/50]
28.06.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.09.2011Fee for grant paid
29.09.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.06.2011
Opposition(s)10.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/42]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
22.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006086721  (WAKAHARA SHINICHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0076]; figures 5-14 *;
 [X]US2006099001  (ASAKURA KENJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,12 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0328] - paragraph [0351]; figures 29,30 *;
 [I]US6195525  (MAEYAMA RYUICHIRO [JP]) [I] 1 * column 9, line 55 - column 12, line 67; figures 1-16 *;
 [A]EP1621940  (RICOH KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0061]; figures 1-24 *
by applicantUS2006086721
 US2006099001
 US6195525