Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1967699

EP1967699 - Gas turbine engine with an abradable seal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.01.2017
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.06.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
25.06.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
10 Farm Springs Road
Farmington, CT 06032 / US
[2016/43]
Former [2008/37]For all designated states
United Technologies Corporation
United Technologies Building One Financial Plaza
Hartford, CT 06101 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Freling, Melvin
40 Old Meadow Road West
Hartford, CT 06117 / US
02 / Lagueux, Ken
183 Deerfield Drive
Berlin, CT 06037 / US
03 / Strock, Christopher W.
1 Portland Road
Kennebunk, Maine 04043 / US
04 / Pilecki Jr., Joseph G.
90 Oakwoods Road
North Berwick, Maine 03906 / US
 [2008/37]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/17]Hall, Matthew Benjamin
Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
Former [2008/37]Hall, Matthew Benjamin
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date08250742.705.03.2008
[2008/37]
Priority number, dateUS2007068204805.03.2007         Original published format: US 682048
[2008/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1967699
Date:10.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1967699
Date:25.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:F01D11/00, F01D11/12
[2008/37]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2009/20]
Former [2008/37]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Gasturbinentriebwerk mit einer abschleifbaren Dichtung[2008/37]
English:Gas turbine engine with an abradable seal[2008/37]
French:Moteur à turbine à gaz avec une garniture d'étanchéité abradable[2008/37]
Examination procedure15.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/05]
21.01.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.03.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
16.04.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
13.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.02.2012Fee for grant paid
16.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.01.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  03.12.2012  10.12.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft
Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1
80333 München / DE
 [2017/48]
Former [2013/02]
Opponent(s)01  03.12.2012   
Siemens AG
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
05.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
16.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.10.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.01.2017Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition28.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0522/17
29.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
04.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
14.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XY]GB2226050  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8,10-14,16-20 * abstract * * page 3, line 5 - line 9 * * page 3, line 31 - line 32 * * figure 1 * * page 7, line 16 - line 19 * [Y] 6-10,18,19;
 [XY]US5314304  (WIEBE DAVID J [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,11-14,16,17,20 * abstract * * column 2, line 48 - line 50 * * column 3, line 8 - line 11 * * column 4, line 24 - line 26 * * figures 1,6 * * column 4, line 41 - line 44 * [Y] 6-10,18,19;
 [PX]EP1876326  (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [PX] 1-4,10-16,19,20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0011] * * paragraph [0015] * * figures 2,4 *;
 [Y]US5780171  (NISSLEY DAVID M [US], et al) [Y] 6-10,18,19 * column 4, line 15 - line 18 * * column 6, line 28 - line 32 *;
 [A]US4218066  (ACKERMANN WILLIAM [US]) [A] 3 * abstract * * column 2, line 11 - line 13 *;
 [PA]US2008044278  (PAPROTNA HUBERTUS E [US], et al) [PA] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] * * figure 6 *;
 [PA]EP1878876  (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [PA] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0035] * * figure 2 *
ExaminationEP1555392
 GB2139114
 US5705231
by applicantGB2226050
 US5314304
 EP1876326