Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025992

EP2025992 - Light-emitting diode lamp [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.01.2015
Database last updated on 11.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chang Wah Electromaterials Inc.
6F, No.16, East 7th Street
Nan-Tze Export Processing Zone
Kaohsiung / TW
[2014/03]
Former [2013/50]For all designated states
Chang Wah Electromaterials Inc.
6F, No.16, East 7th Street
Nan-Tze Export Processing Zone
Kaohsiung / TW
For all designated states
Lustrous International Technology Ltd.
5F., No. 212-1, Section 3 Datong Road
Sijhih City, Taipei Country 221 / TW
Former [2011/07]For all designated states
Top Energy Saving System Corp.
3F., No. 115, Wu-Kung 3rd Rd. Wugu Township, Taipei County
24891 / TW
For all designated states
Lustrous International Technology Ltd.
5F., No. 212-1, Section 3 Datong Road
Sijhih City, Taipei Country 221 / TW
Former [2009/33]For all designated states
GE Investment Co., Ltd.
3F.-8, No. 57, Sec. 1 Dunhua S. Rd. Songshan, Taipai
105 / TW
For all designated states
Lustrous International Technology Ltd.
5F., No. 212-1, Section 3 Datong Road
Sijhih City, Taipei Country 221 / TW
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Topco Innovation Co. Ltd.
12F., No. 100, Sec. 4 Civic Boulevard Da-an District
Taipei City 106 / TW
For all designated states
Lustrous International Technology Ltd.
5F., No. 212-1, Section 3 Datong Road
Sijhih City, Taipei Country 221 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Tsai, Wen-Kuei
No. 230, Sec.1
Jhong-Hua Road, 12 Neighborhood
Jhong-Mei Village
Sin-Jhuang City Taipei County / TW
02 / Liu, Chia-Chi
5F, No. 212-1
Section 3, Datong Road
Sijhih City Taipei County 221 / TW
03 / Wang, Chun-Chien
No. 5, Alley 2, Lane 753
Kangning Street
Sijhih City Taipei County 221 / TW
04 / Wu, Ching-Hua
2F., No.3, Alley 12, Lane 80
Dongsin Street
Nangang District Taipei City 115 / TW
 [2014/09]
Former [2009/08]01 / Tsai, Wen-Kuei
No. 230, Sec.1 Jhong-Hua Road, 12 Neighborhood Jhong-Mei Village
Sin-Jhuang City Taipei County / TW
02 / Liu, Chia-Chi
5F, No. 212-1 Section 3, Datong Road
Sijhih City Taipei County 221 / TW
03 / Wang, Chun-Chien
No. 5, Alley 2, Lane 753 Kangning Street
Sijhih City Taipei County 221 / TW
04 / Wu, Ching-Hua
2F., No.3, Alley 12, Lane 80 Dongsin Street
Nangang District Taipei City 115 / TW
Representative(s)Karakatsanis, Georgios , et al
Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei
Dietlindenstrasse 18
80802 München / DE
[2014/09]
Former [2011/07]Karakatsanis, Georgios , et al
Haft - Karakatsanis Occamstrasse 3
80802 München / DE
Former [2010/25]Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre
London WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2010/18]Oxley, Robin John George , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2009/08]Johnson, Terence Leslie
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date08251343.307.04.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateCN2007114116313.08.2007         Original published format: CN200710141163
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025992
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2025992
Date:30.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025992
Date:26.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.01.2013
ClassificationInternational:F21V29/02, F21K99/00
[2013/42]
Former International [2009/08]F21K7/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Lichtemittierende Diodenlampe[2009/08]
English:Light-emitting diode lamp[2009/08]
French:Lampe à diodes luminescentes[2009/08]
Examination procedure24.07.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.07.2013Examination requested  [2013/36]
02.12.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.01.2014Fee for grant paid
07.01.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.12.2013
Opposition(s)27.11.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2015/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
21.04.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.04.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.04.2008
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
TR26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU07.04.2008
AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
GR27.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/25]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
BG26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2016/16]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
MT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SI26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/21]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
IE07.04.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
IT26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU07.04.2014
CH30.04.2014
LI30.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2015/01]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
LU07.04.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/52]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
MC26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/50]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
ES26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
PL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
SK26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/49]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
RO26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/48]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
CZ26.02.2014
DK26.02.2014
EE26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/42]AT26.02.2014
BE26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
HR26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
LV26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/39]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
NL26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]AT26.02.2014
CY26.02.2014
FI26.02.2014
LT26.02.2014
SE26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
PT26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.02.2014
NO26.05.2014
IS26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2005174780  (PARK CHANG S [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] * [A] 3,4;
 [XA]US2006193139  (SUN TSUNG-TING [TW], et al) [X] 1,5-9,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0025] * [A] 2,3,10;
 [XA]GB2420172  (FOWLER JAMES ANDREW [GB]) [X] 1,5-7,9 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - page 5, line 9 * [A] 2-4,8,10,11;
 [I]WO02066889  (DIALIGHT CORP [US]) [I] 1,5-7 * page 1, line 1 - page 10, line 5; figure - *;
 [A]US2004222516  (LIN TING-HAO [TW], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0001] - [0023]; figure - *;
 [A]EP1705421  (NURIPLAN CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] *;
 [A]US5882108  (FRAIZER ROBERT L [US]) [A] 2,3 * figure - * * column 1, line 1 - column 7 *;
 [A]JPH0660705  (KOITO MFG CO LTD) [A] 2,3 * abstract *