Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1993080

EP1993080 - Operation of amusement or gaming machines [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.01.2010
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.02.2010  [2010/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Electrocoin Leisure (S.Wales) Limited
Advance House, 186 Brent Crescent
London, NW10 7XR / GB
[2008/47]
Inventor(s)01 / Stergides, John
47 Witley Court Coram Street
London, WC1N 1HD / GB
02 / Dinning, Andrew
18 St. Peter's Terrace Low Bristol Road
Bath Avon, BA2 3BT / GB
03 / Troi, Robert
18 St. Peter's Terrace Low Bristol Road
Bath Avon, BA2 3BT / GB
 [2008/47]
Representative(s)Wilson Gunn
Blackfriars House The Parsonage
5th Floor
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/47]Wilson Gunn
5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage
Manchester M3 2JA / GB
Application number, filing date08251561.029.04.2008
[2008/47]
Priority number, dateGB2007000915712.05.2007         Original published format: GB 0709157
[2008/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1993080
Date:19.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1993080
Date:11.02.2009
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:G07F17/32
[2008/47]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2008/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Betrieb von Unterhaltungs- oder Spielautomaten[2008/47]
English:Operation of amusement or gaming machines[2008/47]
French:Fonctionnement d'appareil de jeu ou de loisir[2008/47]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/05]
15.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/05]
Documents cited:Search[X]US2004235551  (WALKER JAY S [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0217] - paragraph [0218] *;
 [X]US5533727  (DEMAR LAWRENCE E [US]) [X] 1-11 * column 3, line 43 - column 6, line 55; figures 3,5 *;
 [X]WO2007032881  (WMS GAMING INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0041]; claims 1-5 * * abstract *;
 [X]US2006019744  (ROEMER MICKEY [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0078] * * abstract *;
 [X]US2001055990  (ACRES JOHN F [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0050]; figures 2,4 *;
 [X]WO0017825  (MIKOHN GAMING CORP [US]) [X] 1-11 * page 9 - page 46 *;
 [X]US2005085300  (JOHNSON SAM [US]) [X] 1-11 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0048] *;
 [X]US2007026935  (WOLF BRYAN D [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2350715  (IGT UK LTD [GB]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *