blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1988479

EP1988479 - Coil optimization for magnetic stimulation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2011
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.05.2011  [2011/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The University of Utah Research Foundation
615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310
Salt Lake City, Utah 84108 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]For all designated states
The University of Utah Research Foundation
615 Arapeen Drive, Suite 310 Salt Lake City
Utah 84108 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Olree, Kenneth Stephen
14 Cattail Road
Searcy Arkansas 72143 / US
02 / Horch, Kenneth W.
15002 N. Buena Vida Court
Fountain Hills Arizona 85268 / US
 [2008/45]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/45]Price, Nigel John King
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08251580.030.04.2008
[2008/45]
Priority number, dateUS2007074338202.05.2007         Original published format: US 743382
[2008/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1988479
Date:05.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/45]
ClassificationIPC:G06F17/50, // H01F7/00
[2008/45]
CPC:
A61N2/02 (EP,US); G06F30/20 (EP,US); A61N2/006 (EP,US);
G06F2111/04 (EP,US); H01F7/202 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/45]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Spulenoptimierung zur magnetischen Stimulation[2008/45]
English:Coil optimization for magnetic stimulation[2008/45]
French:Optimisation de bobine pour stimulation magnétique[2008/45]
Examination procedure03.11.2010Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/20]
10.12.2010Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2011/20]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.04.201003   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.