Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2020596

EP2020596 - Electrochemical measurement system comprising test strip and meter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/06]Test strip and connector
[2015/15]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.05.2016
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.12.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 10.01.2018  [2018/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lifescan Scotland Limited
Beechwood Business Park North Inverness
Inverness-Shire IV2 3ED / GB
[2009/06]
Inventor(s)01 / Docherty, Edward
12 Stratherrick Gardens
Inverness, IV2 4LZ / GB
02 / Kermani, Mahyar Z.
3154 Gulfstream St.
Pleasanton, CA 94588 / US
 [2009/06]
Representative(s)Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2015/28]
Former [2009/51]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2009/06]Tunstall, Christopher Stephen , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date08252500.723.07.2008
[2009/06]
Priority number, dateUS2007078254824.07.2007         Original published format: US 782548
[2009/06]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2020596
Date:04.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/06]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2020596
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2020596
Date:08.07.2015
Language:EN
[2015/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.10.2012
ClassificationInternational:G01N27/30, C12Q1/00, G01N33/487
[2009/06]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2013/31]
Former [2013/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  LI 
Former [2013/29]
Former [2009/06]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Elektrochemisches Messsystem mit Teststreifen und Messgerät[2015/15]
English:Electrochemical measurement system comprising test strip and meter[2015/15]
French:Système de mesure électrochimique avec bandelette réactive et mesureur[2015/15]
Former [2009/06]Teststreifen und Anschluss
Former [2009/06]Test strip and connector
Former [2009/06]Bandelette réactive et connecteur
Examination procedure14.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.05.2013Examination requested  [2013/30]
28.08.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2015Fee for grant paid
26.05.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.05.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.08.2013
Opposition(s)11.04.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU23.07.2008
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
BG08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MT08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
LU23.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
[2018/02]
Former [2017/39]HU23.07.2008
AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
BG08.07.2015
CY08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MT08.07.2015
NL08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
TR08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2017/22]AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
MT08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2017/03]AT08.07.2015
BE08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/36]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SI08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/23]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
RO08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
SK08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/22]AT08.07.2015
CZ08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
EE08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
MC08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/20]AT08.07.2015
DK08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/11]AT08.07.2015
FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/10]FI08.07.2015
HR08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
PL08.07.2015
SE08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
IS08.11.2015
PT09.11.2015
Former [2016/09]FI08.07.2015
LT08.07.2015
LV08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
GR09.10.2015
Former [2016/08]LT08.07.2015
NO08.10.2015
Former [2016/07]LT08.07.2015
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2005019953  (GROLL HENNING [US]) [X] 1-8,12-18 * paragraphs [0002] , [0010] , [0075] - [0086]; figures 10-14 * [I] 9-11;
 [XI]US2005045476  (NEEL GARY T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * paragraphs [0050] , [0052] , [0056] , [0076] , [0077]; figures 1,14 * [I] 4-12,14-18;
 [XI]US2007110615  (NEEL GARY T [US], et al) [X] 1-3,13 * paragraphs [0042] , [0051] - [0054]; figures 4,5 * [I] 2-12,14-18
by applicantUS2005096409
 WO2004040948
 WO2004040290
 WO2004040287
 WO2004040285
 WO2004040005
 WO2004039897
 WO2004039600
 US6179979
 US5653918
 US5708247
 US6046051
 WO0167099
 WO0173124