Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022837

EP2022837 - Process and apparatus for recovering power from fcc product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UOP LLC
25 East Algonquin Road, P.O. Box 5017
Des Plaines, IL 60017-5017 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / Zhu, Xin Xiong
UOP LLC, 25 East Algonquin Road, P.O. Box 5017
Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US
02 / Couch, Keith Allen
UOP LLC, 25 East Algonquin Road, P.O. Box 5017
Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US
03 / Glavin, James Patrick
UOP LLC, 25 East Algonquin Road, P.O. Box 5017
Des Plaines, Illinois 60017-5017 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08252572.629.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateUS2007083213601.08.2007         Original published format: US 832136
US2007083214301.08.2007         Original published format: US 832143
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2022837
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C10G11/18
[2009/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Rückgewinnung von Energie aus einem FCC-Produkt[2009/07]
English:Process and apparatus for recovering power from fcc product[2009/07]
French:Procédé et appareil de récupération d'alimentation à partir d'un produit fcc[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/06]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/06]
31.12.2099Examination requested  [2009/41]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4431529  (CARSON DON B [US]) [X] 1-10 * column 1, line 40 - line 45 * * column 3, line 41 - line 65 * * column 5, line 47 - line 59; claims 1,5 *;
 [A]EP0426400  (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 [A]US5114682  (GOELZER ALAN R [US]) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]US3012962  (DYGERT JUSTIN C) [A] 1-10 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [A]CA2006316  (PAPPAL DAVID A [US]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2; claim 1 *