Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028152

EP2028152 - Method and apparatus for providing diagnostics of a lifting magnet system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.01.2015
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
EDW.C. Levy CO
8800 Dix Avenue
Detroit, MI 48209 / US
[2009/09]
Inventor(s)01 / Pollock, Michael
5780 John R
Troy, Michigan 48085 / US
02 / Kahl, Fred
8021 Burning Bush Rd.
Grosse Ile, Michigan 48138 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)McCartney, Jonathan William , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[2013/46]
Former [2009/09]Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M.
HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date08252594.030.07.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateUS2007084390423.08.2007         Original published format: US 843904
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028152
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028152
Date:26.03.2014
Language:EN
[2014/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:B66C15/00, B66C23/90, B66C1/08
[2013/36]
Former International [2009/09]B66C1/08, // G06Q10/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Diagnosehilfen für ein Hebemagnetsystem[2009/09]
English:Method and apparatus for providing diagnostics of a lifting magnet system[2009/09]
French:Procédé et appareil pour fournir des diagnostics d'un système de levage magnetique[2009/09]
Examination procedure20.08.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
15.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.11.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.07.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2014Fee for grant paid
14.02.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.06.2009
Opposition(s)06.01.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2008
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
TR26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU30.07.2008
AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/28]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
MT26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
GR27.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2016/21]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
MC26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/37]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
IE30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/36]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SI26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/24]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
GB30.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/20]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
CH31.07.2014
LI31.07.2014
Former [2015/18]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
IT26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
Former [2015/13]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
LU30.07.2014
Former [2015/08]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
DK26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2015/02]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
PT28.07.2014
Former [2014/51]AT26.03.2014
BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/50]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
ES26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
NL26.03.2014
PL26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
SK26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/49]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
IS26.07.2014
Former [2014/48]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
CZ26.03.2014
EE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
BG26.06.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/47]BE26.03.2014
CY26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/46]BE26.03.2014
FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/41]FI26.03.2014
HR26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
LV26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/37]FI26.03.2014
LT26.03.2014
SE26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Former [2014/36]LT26.03.2014
NO26.06.2014
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0006480  (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6-8,12,13,16-18,20-22,25,26 * the whole document * [Y] 10,19;
 [XY]US6744372  (SHAW JACK B [US], et al) [X] 22-27,29 * the whole document * [Y] 10,19,30,31;
 [Y]JPH06127886  (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND, et al) [Y] 30,31 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2002342544  (KOBELCO CONSTR MACHINERY LTD, et al) [A] 22-31 * abstract *;
 [A]JP2002187689  (TCM CORP) [A] 22,29,30 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0781887  (KOMATSU MEC CORP, et al) [A] 3,7,8,12-14,22,24-27 * abstract *
by applicantJPH06127886