Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023630

EP2023630 - Conferencing system, server, image display method, and computer program product [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.08.2018(Expected) grantpublished on 19.09.2018  [2018/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome
Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
[2018/38]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Seiko Epson Corporation
4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163-0811 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inoue, Noboru
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation
3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP
 [2018/38]
Former [2009/07]01 / Inoue, Noboru
c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5 Owa 3-chome
Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP
Representative(s)Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
[2018/38]
Former [2009/07]Cloughley, Peter Andrew , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date08252634.405.08.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateJP2007020564707.08.2007         Original published format: JP 2007205647
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2023630
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/07]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2023630
Date:01.12.2010
[2010/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2023630
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/15
[2009/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2018/38]
Former [2011/32]DE,  FR,  GB 
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Konferenzsystem, Server, Bildanzeigemethode und Rechnerprogrammierungsprodukt[2010/42]
English:Conferencing system, server, image display method, and computer program product[2009/07]
French:Système de conference, serveur, methode de visualisation d'image et produit de logiciel d'ordinateur[2010/42]
Former [2009/07]Konferenzsystem, Server, Bildanzeigevorrichtung und Computerprogrammprodukt
Former [2009/07]Système de conférence, serveur, procédé d'affichage d'images et produit de programme informatique
Examination procedure01.06.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2011Examination requested  [2011/28]
07.06.2011Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
07.07.2011Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
07.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.11.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.02.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.06.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.08.2018Fee for grant paid
06.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.07.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
05.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
05.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
08.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
08.08.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
03.08.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2004130568  (NAGANO MIKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13 * paragraph [0162] - paragraph [0164]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0209] - paragraph [0210]; figures 3,8 * * paragraphs [0228] , [0234]; figures 19,20 * * paragraph [0175] - paragraph [0177]; figure 4 * * figures 15,21 * [I] 8
by applicantJP2004054134