Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026084

EP2026084 - Single coil parallel imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2014
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip17.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.02.2014  [2014/08]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ALLEGHENY-SINGER RESEARCH INSTITUTE
320 East North Avenue
Pittsburgh, PA 15212 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / Doyle, Mark
310 Knobs Hill Court
Wexford Pennsylvania 15090 / US
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Rees, Simon John Lewis , et al
Haseltine Lake LLP
Redcliff Quay
120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Rees, Simon John Lewis , et al
Haseltine Lake Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street
Bristol BS1 6HU / GB
Application number, filing date08252643.506.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007089061007.08.2007         Original published format: US 890610
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026084
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026084
Date:22.09.2010
[2010/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.2010
ClassificationInternational:G01R33/561, G01R33/563
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Parallele MRI mit einer Einzelspule[2009/08]
English:Single coil parallel imaging[2009/08]
French:IRM parallèle avec bobine unique[2009/08]
Examination procedure21.03.2011Examination requested  [2011/17]
05.07.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.05.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.09.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/08]
11.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/08]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.05.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
22.06.2011Request for further processing filed
22.06.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
05.07.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
30.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201306   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9113367  (PICKER INT INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *;
 [XI]  TSAO J ET AL, "Optimizing spatiotemporal sampling for k-t BLAST and k-t SENSE: Application to high-resolution real-time cardiac steady-state free precession", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20050519), vol. 53, pages 1372 - 1382, XP002595623 [X] 1-5,13 * section "Theory" * [I] 6-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20483
 [XI]  KOZERKE S ET AL, "Accelerating cardiac cine 3D imaging using k-t BLAST", 20040701; 20040700, (20040701), vol. 52, no. 1, pages 19 - 26, XP002369277 [X] 1-5,13 * section "Materials and Methods" * [I] 6-12

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20145
 [I]  WEIGER M, PRUESSMANN KP, BOESIGER P, "2D SENSE for faster 3D MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE MATERIALS IN PHYSICS, BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 14, pages 10 - 19, XP002595624 [I] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  KELLMAN P ET AL, "ADAPTIVE SENSITIVITY ENCODING INCORPORATING TEMPORAL FILTERING (TSENSE)", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/MRM.1113, (20010501), vol. 45, no. 5, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 846 - 852, XP001011073 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.1113
 [A]  XIAOPING HU ET AL, "REDUCTION OF FIELD OF VIEW FOR DYNAMIC IMAGING", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (19940601), vol. 32, no. 6, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 691 - 694, XP000444469 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  MADORE B ET AL, "Unaliasing by Fourier-Encoding THE OVERLAPS USING THE TEMPORAL DIMENSION (UNFOLD), APPLIED TO CARDIAC IMAGING AND FMRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US LNKD- DOI:10.1002/(SICI)1522-2594(199911)42:5<813::AID-MRM1>3.0.CO;2-S, (19990101), vol. 42, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 813 - 828, XP002229781 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1522-2594(199911)42:5<813::AID-MRM1>3.0.CO;2-S
 [A]  WANG J ET AL, "A SMASH/SENSE Related Method Using Ratios of Array Coil Profiles", INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE. 7TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION. ISMRM '99. PHILADELPHIA, PA, MAY 22 19990522; 19990522 - 19990528 BERKELEY, CA : ISMRM, US, (19990522), vol. 3, page 1648, XP002207882 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [A]  PETR J ET AL, "Fast Parallel MRI Reconstruction Using B-spline Approximation (PROBER)", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20060101), vol. 6142, ISSN 1605-7422, pages 61423P - 1, XP002487393 [A] 1-13 * the whole document *
by applicant   TSAO J ET AL., "Optimizing spatiotemporal sampling for k-t BLAST and k-t SENSE: Application to high-resolution real-time cardiac steady-state free precession", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20050519), vol. 53, doi:doi:10.1002/mrm.20483, pages 1372 - 1382, XP002595623

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20483
    KOZERKE S ET AL., "Accelerating cardiac cine 3D imaging using k-t BLAST", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, (20040701), vol. 52, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1002/mrm.20145, pages 19 - 26, XP002369277

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20145
    WEIGER M, PRUESSMANN KP, BOESIGER P, "2D SENSE for faster 3D MRI", MAGNETIC RESONANCE MATERIALS IN PHYSICS, BIOLOGY AND MEDICINE, (2002), vol. 14, pages 10 - 19, XP002595624