Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2026022

EP2026022 - Extended cold (battery backup) refrigerator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.01.2017  [2017/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Whirlpool Corporation
2000 N. M 63
Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US
[2016/04]
Former [2009/08]For all designated states
Whirlpool Corporation
2000 N M-63
Benton Harbor, MI 49022 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Litch, Andrew David
1025 Harrison Avenue
St Joseph, MI 49085 / US
02 / Sigwalt, Rodrigo Alexandre
1095 Guilherme St.
Apartment 102, Block Helena
Joinville / BR
03 / Bortoletto, Anderson
2504 South State Street
St Joseph, MI 49085 / US
04 / Anderson, Vincent Paul
2810 Cypress Court
Evansville, IN 47711 / US
05 / Stagg, Michael E.
6000 Lakeshore Drive
Evansville, IN 47720 / US
06 / Guess, Ronald Wayne
3623 E. Boonv-New Harmony
Evansville, IN 47725 / US
07 / Moeller, Jill C.
4347 Huntingdon Ridge Circle
Newburgh, IN 47630 / US
08 / Jeffery, Randell L.
5835 Ridge Road
Stevensville, MI 49127 / US
09 / Nibbelink, Matthew J.
1489 Nelson Road
St Joseph, MI 49127 / US
 [2016/04]
Former [2009/08]01 / Litch, Andrew David
1025 Harrison Avenue
St Joseph, MI 49085 / US
02 / Sigwalt, Rodrigo Alexandre
1095 Guilherme St. Apartment 102, Block Helena
Joinville / BR
03 / Bortoletto, Anderson
2504 South State Street
St Joseph, MI 49085 / US
04 / Anderson, Vincent Paul
2810 Cypress Court
Evansville, IN 47711 / US
05 / Stagg, Michael E.
6000 Lakeshore Drive
Evansville, IN 47720 / US
06 / Guess, Ronald Wayne
3623 E. Boonv-New Harmony
Evansville, IN 47725 / US
07 / Moeller, Jill C.
4347 Huntingdon Ridge Circle
Newburgh, IN 47630 / US
08 / Jeffery, Randell L.
5835 Ridge Road
Stevensville, MI 49127 / US
09 / Nibbelink, Matthew J.
1489 Nelson Road
St Joseph, MI 49127 / US
Representative(s)Nicholls, Michael John
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[2016/04]
Former [2009/08]Nicholls, Michael John
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London
WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08252645.007.08.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateUS2007083964116.08.2007         Original published format: US 839641
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2026022
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2026022
Date:10.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2026022
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:F25D29/00, F25D17/06, // F25B27/00
[2014/50]
Former International [2009/08]F25D29/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   IT [2015/28]
Former [2009/08]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Erweiterter Kühlschrank (Batteriebackup)[2009/08]
English:Extended cold (battery backup) refrigerator[2009/08]
French:Réfrigérateur à froid étendu (batterie de secours)[2009/08]
Examination procedure28.05.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.05.2015Examination requested  [2015/28]
11.06.2015Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
17.07.2015Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
30.07.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2015Fee for grant paid
24.11.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.11.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.07.2015
Opposition(s)28.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
19.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
11.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XAYI]US2006179870  (BYRNE ROBERT M [US], et al) [X] 1-5,8,12,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0020] - [0032] * [A] 10 [Y] 14,15 [I] 6,7,9,11;
 [Y]US2006260335  (MONTUORO LOU [US], et al) [Y] 14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0022] , [0070] , [0075] *;
 [A]DE3810655  (HOLZER WALTER [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 3 - column 2, line 45 *