Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028546

EP2028546 - A method of performing model-based scanner tuning, a computer program and a lithographic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.08.2013
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 11.09.2013  [2013/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ASML Netherlands BV
De Run 6501
5504 DR Veldhoven / NL
[2010/37]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Brion Technologies, Inc.
4211 Burton Drive
Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Ye, Jun
2658 Bryant Street
Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US
02 / Cao, Yu
10157 Myer Pl.
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Peters, John Antoine , et al
ASML Netherlands BV
Corporate Intellectual Property
P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
[N/P]
Former [2010/52]Peters, John Antoine , et al
ASML Netherlands BV Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
Former [2009/36]Van den Hooven, Jan , et al
ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324
5500 AH Veldhoven / NL
Former [2009/09]Leeming, John Gerard
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date08252671.612.08.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateUS2007089240722.08.2007         Original published format: US 892407
[2009/09]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2028546
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2028546
Date:09.12.2009
[2009/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028546
Date:03.10.2012
Language:EN
[2012/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.11.2009
ClassificationInternational:G03F7/20
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2010/34]
Former [2010/33](deleted) 
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Durchführung einer modellbasierten Scannerabstimmung, Computerprogramm und lithografischer Apparat[2009/09]
English:A method of performing model-based scanner tuning, a computer program and a lithographic apparatus[2009/09]
French:Procédé pour réaliser le réglage d'un scanner basé sur un modèle, programme informatique et appareil lithographique[2009/09]
Examination procedure08.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/36]
10.06.2010Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
26.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2010Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
22.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2012Fee for grant paid
09.05.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  26.08.2010
Opposition(s)04.07.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
23.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1630617  (ASML MASKTOOLS BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0021] - [0039]; figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1560073  (ASML MASKTOOLS BV [NL]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0042] - [0053]; figures 1,2 *
by applicantUS6046792
 US5969441
 US5296891
 US5523193
 US5229872