blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2031535

EP2031535 - Association of support surfaces and beds [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  23.08.2013
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 25.09.2013  [2013/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hill-Rom Services, Inc.
1069 State Route 46 East
Batesville, IN 47006 / US
[2009/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Zhao, Simeon
2204 Oak Stream Lane
Apex NC 27523 / US
02 / Bhatia, Daleep
110 Bosswood Court
Cary NC 27518 / US
03 / McNeely, Craig A
3452 Putter Place
Columbus IN 47203 / US
04 / VanderPohl, Irvin John III
938 W County Road 250 S
Greensburg IN 47240 / US
05 / Riley, Carl William
3773 North State Road 129
Milan IN 47031 / US
06 / Glidewell, Patricia Anne
709 Matney Lane
Apex NC 27502 / US
07 / Ferguson, David Clarence
908 Marshall Farm Street
Wake Forest NC 27587 / US
08 / Huster, Keith Adam
P.O. Box 71
Sunman IN 47041 / US
 [2009/11]
Former [2009/10]01 / Zhao, Simeon
2204 Oak Stream Lane
Apex NC 27523 / US
02 / Bhatia, Daleep
110 Bosswood Court
Cary NC 27518 / US
03 / McNeely, Craig A
3452 Putter Place
Columbus IN 47203 / US
04 / VanderPohl, Irvin John III
2471 East County Road 475S
Greensburg IN 47240 / US
05 / Riley, Carl William
3773 North State Road 129
Milan IN 47031 / US
06 / Glidewell, Patricia Anne
709 Matney Lane
Apex NC 27502 / US
07 / Ferguson, David Clarence
908 Marshall Farm Street
Wake Forest NC 27587 / US
08 / Huster, Keith Adam
P.O. Box 71
Sunman IN 47041 / US
Representative(s)Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building
10 Whitechapel High Street
London E1 8QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/10]Findlay, Alice Rosemary
Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London
WC1X 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date08252806.822.08.2008
[2009/10]
Priority number, dateUS2007084690629.08.2007         Original published format: US 846906
[2009/10]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2031535
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2031535
Date:15.05.2013
Language:EN
[2013/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.04.2013
ClassificationIPC:G06F19/00, A61G12/00, A61G7/00
[2013/20]
CPC:
G16H40/63 (EP,US); A61G12/00 (EP,US); G06Q50/22 (US);
G16H40/20 (EP,US); G16H40/67 (EP,US); A61G7/018 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/10]G06F19/00, A61G12/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/10]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verknüpfung von Hilfsflächen und Betten[2009/10]
English:Association of support surfaces and beds[2009/10]
French:Associations de surfaces de soutien et de lits[2009/10]
Examination procedure01.03.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/39]
10.04.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.201205   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2006000041  (UNIV MONASH [AU], et al) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 14, line 18 - line 29 *;
 [XP]US2007210917  (COLLINS WILLIAMS F JR [US], et al) [XP] 9,11,12 * paragraphs [0006] , [0051]; figures 2,5,6,7 ** paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0080] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.