EP2028108 - Aseptic container filling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Flexifill Ltd Unit 1, Short Way Thornbury Industrial Estate Thornbury Bristol BS35 3UT / GB | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shipway, Malcolm Austin c/o Flexifill Ltd Unit 1, Short Way Thornbury Industrial Estate Thornbury Bristol BS35 3UT / GB | 02 /
Shipway, Clive Antony c/o Flexifill Ltd Unit 1, Short Way Thornbury Industrial Estate Thornbury Bristol BS35 3UT / GB | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M. Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander M. HASELTINE LAKE Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 08252812.6 | 22.08.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | GB20070016374 | 22.08.2007 Original published format: GB 0716374 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2028108 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65B55/02, B65B55/10 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
B65B3/045 (GB);
B65B55/022 (EP,GB);
B65B55/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Befüllung aseptischer Behälter | [2009/09] | English: | Aseptic container filling | [2009/09] | French: | Remplissage aseptique d'un récipient | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 26.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 01.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/07] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0911260 (SASIB PROCESSING & SEAMING MAC [IT]) [X] 1-10,12-15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0021] , [0024] , [0026] - [0028]; figure - *; | [X]EP1067052 (SMITH DAVID S PACKAGING [GB]) [X] 12-15 * paragraphs [0031] - [0041]; figure - *; | [A]US2787875 (JOHNSON ROBERT A) [A] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0115963 (SCHOLLE CORP [US]) [A] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0088735 (EL SRL [IT]) [A] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US4805378 (ANDERSON IAN M [AU]) [A] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3510859 (NILGEN ELMAR [DE]) [A] 1-10,12-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0911260 | EP1067052 |