Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2040490

EP2040490 - Method and apparatus for a hearing assistance device using mems sensors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  05.10.2012
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Starkey Laboratories, Inc.
6600 Washington Avenue South
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[2009/13]
Inventor(s)01 / Burns, Thomas Howard
427 Ridge Lane
Chaska 55318, Minnesota / US
02 / Green, Matthew
561 Kassel Drive
Chaska 55318, Minnesota / US
 [2009/13]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/45]Maury, Richard Philip
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Former [2009/13]Maury, Richard Philip
Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date08253052.817.09.2008
[2009/13]
Priority number, dateUS20070973399P18.09.2007         Original published format: US 973399 P
[2009/13]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2040490
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/13]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2040490
Date:02.06.2010
[2010/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2040490
Date:07.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.05.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04R25/00, H04M1/03, H04R1/10
[2009/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/13]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung für ein Hörgerät mit MEMS-Sensoren[2009/13]
English:Method and apparatus for a hearing assistance device using mems sensors[2009/13]
French:Procédé et appareil pour dispositif d'aide auditive utilisant des capteurs mems[2009/13]
Examination procedure23.09.2008Examination requested  [2009/13]
01.12.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.08.2012Fee for grant paid
28.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12191166.3  / EP2597891
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.04.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013  16.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street
No. 08-08
18 Tai Seng
Singapore 539775 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
 [2018/09]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013  16.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street, No. 08-08
539775 Singapur / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2016/06]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013  16.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent, No 06-08
Singapur 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2015/23]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013  16.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2015/12]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013  16.08.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
Maier, Daniel Oliver
Siemens AG
Postfach 22 16 34
80506 München / DE
Former [2013/38]
Opponent(s)01  07.08.2013   
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
Miosga, Michael
Siemens AG
Postfach 221634
80506 München / DE
16.09.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.03.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.04.2014Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2014Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor
04.12.2015Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.01.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition11.03.2016Appeal received No.  T0606/16
13.05.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.09.2008
AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
MT07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
TR07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
IE17.09.2013
LU17.09.2013
GB17.09.2016
FR30.09.2016
NL01.10.2016
[2017/40]
Former [2015/34]HU17.09.2008
AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
MT07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
TR07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
IE17.09.2013
LU17.09.2013
Former [2015/32]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
MT07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
TR07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
IE17.09.2013
Former [2014/33]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
IE17.09.2013
Former [2014/20]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
MC07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
IT07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
RO07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
CZ07.11.2012
EE07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
SK07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
BG07.02.2013
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT07.11.2012
BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
PT07.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE07.11.2012
CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/26]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
SI07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/24]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
GR08.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/23]CY07.11.2012
FI07.11.2012
HR07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
LV07.11.2012
PL07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/22]FI07.11.2012
LT07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
ES18.02.2013
IS07.03.2013
Former [2013/21]LT07.11.2012
SE07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
Former [2013/20]LT07.11.2012
NO07.02.2013
Documents cited:Search[XYI]EP1063837  (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0013] * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 4-7,9-15 [I] 2,3;
 [Y]WO2006076531  (OTOLOGICS LLC [US]; MILLER III SCOTT ALLAN [US]) [Y] 10-15 * page 29, line 13 - page 33, line 30; figure 11 *;
 [Y]US6330339  (ISHIGE RYUUICHI [JP] ET AL) [Y] 4-7,9 * column 4, line 9 - line 42; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2007036348  (ORR KEVIN [CA]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0042] * * figures 2-5 *;
 [A]WO2004092746  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0021] * * figure - *;
 [A]WO0057616  (ERICSSON INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 15 - page 3, line 9 * * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 5 *
by applicant   - "Ampclusion Management 101: Understanding Variables", THE HEARING REVIEW, (200208), pages 22 - 32
    - F. KUK; C. LUDVIGSEN, "Ampclusion Management 102: A 5-step Protocol", THE HEARING REVIEW, (200209), pages 34 - 43
 US20070973399