Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2080986

EP2080986 - Method of prioritizing similar names of locations for use by a navigation system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2015
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2018New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
Kennedyplein 222
5611 ZT Eindhoven / NL
[2016/25]
Former [2013/31]For all designated states
HERE Global B.V.
De Run 1115
5503 LB Veldhoven / NL
Former [2013/09]For all designated states
NAVTEQ B.V.
De Run 1115
5503 LB Veldhoven / NL
Former [2009/30]For all designated states
Navteq North America, LLC
425 West Randolph Street Suite 1200
Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Grun, Raimund
Sulzbacherstrasse 15
65760 Eschborn / DE
 [2009/30]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/51]Potter Clarkson LLP
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham
NG1 5GG / GB
Former [2009/30]Pelly, Jason Charles
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date08254009.715.12.2008
[2009/30]
Priority number, dateUS2008001560317.01.2008         Original published format: US 15603
[2009/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2080986
Date:22.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2080986
Date:04.01.2012
Language:EN
[2012/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2011
ClassificationInternational:G01C21/36
[2009/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/30]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Priorisierung ähnlicher Ortsnamen zur Verwendung durch ein Navigationssystem[2009/30]
English:Method of prioritizing similar names of locations for use by a navigation system[2009/30]
French:Procédé de priorisation de noms d'emplacement similaires pour une utilisation dans un système de navigation[2009/30]
Examination procedure04.07.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.07.2012Examination requested  [2012/33]
02.01.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
06.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
28.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination30.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0792/17
27.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.01.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
11.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
10.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
13.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
12.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[E]EP2075547  (TRAFFICMASTER PLC [GB]) [E] 1,9,10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0018] , [0021] , [0028] , [0041] *;
 [I]EP1832845  (KLICK TEL AG [DE]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0010] , [0012] , [0014] , [0060] , [0061] *;
 [I]WO0169178  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]; DUCKECK RALF [DE]) [I] 1-10 * page 7, line 6 - line 25 * * abstract *;
 [I]WO03100351  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]; LISTLE HOLGER [DE]; LUEER STEFAN [DE]; BRENNER) [I] 1-10 * abstract *