Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2196842

EP2196842 - Improvements in or relating to waveguides [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  12.11.2010
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2010Refusal of applicationpublished on 15.12.2010  [2010/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAE Systems PLC
6 Carlton Gardens
London SW1Y 5AD / GB
[2010/24]
Representative(s)BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
P.O. Box 87
Warwick House
Farnborough Aerospace Centre
Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/24]BAE SYSTEMS plc Group IP Department
P.O. Box 87 Warwick House Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough
Hampshire GU14 6YU / GB
Application number, filing date08275085.212.12.2008
[2010/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2196842
Date:16.06.2010
Language:EN
[2010/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.06.2009
ClassificationInternational:G02B27/01, F21V8/00
[2010/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/24]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verbesserungen an oder im Zusammenhang mit Wellenleitern[2010/24]
English:Improvements in or relating to waveguides[2010/24]
French:Améliorations de guides d'ondes ou relatives à ceux-ci[2010/24]
Examination procedure06.07.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) [2010/50]
16.07.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/50]
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO0109663  (YEDA RES & DEV [IL], et al) [X] 1,2,11 * page 10, line 28 - line 29; figures 1,2a * * abstract * [Y] 3-10,12;
 [Y]WO2007029032  (BAE SYSTEMS PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 3-10,12 * page 4, line 19 - line 23; figure 2 * * abstract * * page 9, line 6 - line 10 *;
 [Y]EP0077193  (MARCONI AVIONICS [GB]) [Y] 3-10,12 * page 7, line 3 - line 11 *;
 [Y]GB2388673  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 3-10,12 * figure 8 *;
 [Y]WO03081320  (LUMUS LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 8,9 * figures 14,16 *
by applicantWO2007029032