Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2042417

EP2042417 - Hands-free telephone system for a motorcycle, with remote control from the handlebars [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.11.2011
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 06.11.2013  [2013/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Parrot
174 quai de Jemmapes
75010 Paris / FR
[2009/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Seydoux, Henri
99, rue de Courcelles
75017 Paris / FR
02 / Vignau-Lous, Bertrand
144 rue de Clignancourt
75018 Paris / FR
03 / Mathieu, Jérôme
149 rue Lafayette
75010 Paris / FR
04 / Pinto, Guillaume
18 place des Vosges
75004 Paris / FR
 [2009/14]
Representative(s)Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg
SO Square Opéra
5,rue Boudreau
75009 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/52]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
SEP Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2009/48]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2009/14]Dupuis-Latour, Dominique , et al
Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler 10, boulevard Haussmann
75009 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date08290183.627.02.2008
[2009/14]
Priority number, dateFR2007000680928.09.2007         Original published format: FR 0706809
[2009/14]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2042417
Date:01.04.2009
Language:FR
[2009/14]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2042417
Date:29.12.2010
Language:FR
[2010/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:B62J99/00, B62K11/14, A42B3/30, B62J9/00
[2009/14]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/14]
TitleGerman:Telefongerätekombination vom Typ Freisprechanlage für Motorrad mit Fernbedienung am Lenker[2009/14]
English:Hands-free telephone system for a motorcycle, with remote control from the handlebars[2009/14]
French:Ensemble téléphonique de type "mains libres" pour motocycle, télécommandé au guidon[2009/14]
Examination procedure17.03.2008Examination requested  [2009/14]
30.07.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.11.2010Fee for grant paid
17.11.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.09.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
HU29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
IT29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
LU27.02.2011
BE28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
[2013/45]
Former [2013/44]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
IT29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
TR29.12.2010
LU27.02.2011
BE28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2013/25]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
IT29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
LU27.02.2011
BE28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2012/24]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
IT29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BE28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2012/05]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
MT29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BE28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2012/01]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BE28.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/47]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
DK29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
IE29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/42]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
MC28.02.2011
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/38]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
NL29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/37]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
RO29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/36]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
PL29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
SK29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/35]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
CZ29.12.2010
EE29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
IS29.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/34]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
NO29.03.2011
GR30.03.2011
ES09.04.2011
PT29.04.2011
Former [2011/29]AT29.12.2010
CY29.12.2010
FI29.12.2010
HR29.12.2010
LT29.12.2010
LV29.12.2010
SE29.12.2010
SI29.12.2010
BG29.03.2011
Documents cited:Search[A]DE19962603  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2757717  (ALLEGRUCCI ROBERT [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]FR2677826  (NKF [FR]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]KR20020071826  (JEON HYUNG DONG [KR]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-9 *;
 [A]US2005035856  (MCMAHON MICHAEL T [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]DE20317439U  (ECK HEINZ [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [A]US2002014565  (ASE YUKIMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
by applicantDE19962603
 US2005035856
 DE20317439U
 US2002014565