Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2157433

EP2157433 - New method for identifying compounds useful for treating and/or preventing diseases associated with bone loss [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  17.06.2011
Database last updated on 18.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.06.2011Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 20.07.2011  [2011/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS-
3, rue Michel-Ange
75016 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/08]For all designated states
CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)
3, rue Michel Ange
75016 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Blangy, Anne
Enclos Laffoux no. 4 11 avenue de Castelnau
34090 Montpellier / FR
 [2010/08]
Representative(s)Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2010/20]Warcoin, Jacques , et al
Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Former [2010/08]Barbot, Willy , et al
Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
Application number, filing date08290783.318.08.2008
[2010/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2157433
Date:24.02.2010
Language:EN
[2010/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2010/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/08]
TitleGerman:Neues Verfahren zur Identifikation von Komponenten zur Behandlung und/oder Verhinderung von mit Knochenschwund zusammenhängenden Erkrankungen[2010/08]
English:New method for identifying compounds useful for treating and/or preventing diseases associated with bone loss[2010/08]
French:Nouveau procédé pour identifier des composés utiles pour le traitement et/ou la prévention de maladies liées à la perte osseuse[2010/08]
Examination procedure23.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/39]
13.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.2011Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2011/29]
25.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2011/29]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.09.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[XY]  - OMI N ET AL, "Mutation of Dock5, a member of the guanine exchange factor Dock180 superfamily, in the rupture of lens cataract mouse", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, vol. 86, no. 5, ISSN 0014-4835, (20080501), pages 828 - 834, (20080302), XP022640262 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [Y] 5-10

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.exer.2008.02.011
 [Y]  - "SubName: Full=Dedicator of cytokinesis 5;", UniProt, (20080701), Database accession no. B2RY04, URL: EBI, XP002499980 [Y] 5 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "SubName: Full=Dedicator of cytokinesis 5;", UniProt, (20080701), Database accession no. B2RNY0, URL: EBI, XP002499981 [Y] 6 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "RecName: Full=Ras-related C3 botulinum toxin substrate 1; AltName: Full=p21-Rac1; AltName: Full=Ras-like protein TC25; AltName: Full=Cell migration-inducing gene 5 protein; Flags: Precursor;", UniProt, (20040831), Database accession no. P63000, URL: EBI, XP002499982 [Y] 7 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - "RecName: Full=Serine/threonine-protein kinase PAK 1; EC=2.7.11.1; AltName: Full=p21-activated kinase 1; Short=PAK-1; AltName: Full=p65-PAK; AltName: Full=Alpha-PAK;", UniProt, (19971101), Database accession no. Q13153, URL: EBI, XP002499983 [Y] 8-10 * the whole document *
    [ ] - PARRINI MARIA CARLA ET AL, "Pak1 kinase homodimers are autoinhibited in trans and dissociated upon activation by Cdc42 and Rac1.", MOLECULAR CELL JAN 2002, (200201), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1097-2765, pages 73 - 83, XP002499976 [ ] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(01)00428-2
 [AD]  - BRAZIER HÉLÈNE ET AL, "Expression profile of RhoGTPases and RhoGEFs during RANKL-stimulated osteoclastogenesis: identification of essential genes in osteoclasts.", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH SEP 2006, (200609), vol. 21, no. 9, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 1387 - 1398, XP002499977 [AD] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/JBMR.060613
 [A]  - COTE ET AL, "GEF what? Dock180 and related proteins help Rac to polarize cells in new ways", TRENDS IN CELL BIOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD, XX, (20070801), vol. 17, no. 8, ISSN 0962-8924, pages 383 - 393, XP022241553 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tcb.2007.05.001
 [A]  - HA BYUNG GEUN ET AL, "Proteomic profile of osteoclast membrane proteins: identification of Na+/H+ exchanger domain containing 2 and its role in osteoclast fusion.", PROTEOMICS JUL 2008, (200807), vol. 8, no. 13, ISSN 1615-9861, pages 2625 - 2639, XP002499978 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pmic.200701192
 [A]  - FUKUDA AKIRA ET AL, "Regulation of osteoclast apoptosis and motility by small GTPase binding protein Rac1.", JOURNAL OF BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH : THE OFFICIAL JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BONE AND MINERAL RESEARCH DEC 2005, (200512), vol. 20, no. 12, ISSN 0884-0431, pages 2245 - 2253, XP002499979 [A] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1359/JBMR.050816
 [A]  - RAZZOUK S ET AL, "Rac-GTPase, osteoclast cytoskeleton and bone resorption", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, WISSENSCHAFLICHE VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT, STUTTGART, DE, (19990401), vol. 78, no. 4, ISSN 0171-9335, pages 249 - 255, XP009107270 [A] * the whole document *
by applicantWO2005064007
    - COTE; VUORI, J. CELL. SCI., (2002), vol. 115, pages 4901 - 4913
    - SMITH; WATERMAN, AD. APP. MATH., (1981), vol. 2, page 482
    - NEDDLEMAN; WUNSCH, J. MOL. BIOL., (1970), vol. 48, page 443
    - PEARSON; LIPMAN, PROC. NATL. ACD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 2444
    - EDGAR; ROBERT C., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2004), vol. 32, page 1792
    - DE TOLEDO ET AL., FEBS, vol. 480, pages 287 - 292
    - COELHO ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2005), vol. 102, pages 11917 - 11922
    - LASSAUX ET AL., J VIROL., (2005), vol. 79, pages 6560 - 6564
    - BATTINI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., (1999), vol. 96, pages 1385 - 1390
    - ABASSI; VUORI, EMBO J., (2002), vol. 1.21, pages 4571 - 4582
    - GUMIENNY ET AL., CELL, (2001), vol. 107, pages 27 - 41
    - BLANGY ET AL., BIOL. CELL., (2006), vol. 98, no. 9, pages 511 - 22