Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2157433 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2157433



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 75
10.06.2011 Closing of application Search / examination 1
25.02.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
13.09.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
23.08.2010 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
23.08.2010 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.04.2010 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
15.03.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
09.03.2010 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
01.03.2010 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
27.01.2010 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
06.07.2009 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
06.07.2009 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.10.2008 European search opinion Search / examination 5
29.10.2008 European search report Search / examination 4
23.09.2008 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Claims Search / examination 2
18.08.2008 Description Search / examination 13
18.08.2008 Drawings Search / examination 4
18.08.2008 Non-scannable object Search / examination 1
18.08.2008 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 9
18.08.2008 Sequence listing Search / examination 19