Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2157433


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.06.2011 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  20.07.2011  [2011/29]
22.02.2011 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
24.09.2010 Definitive list of designations published on  27.10.2010  [2010/43]
10.09.2010 First examination report
09.09.2010 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
03.09.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.08.2010 Request for examination filed published on  29.09.2010  [2010/39]
16.04.2010 Change - representative published on  19.05.2010  [2010/20]
22.01.2010 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  24.02.2010  [2010/08]