Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2023117

EP2023117 - Method for supercharging a one-cylinder engine on a bench and corresponding device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.01.2010
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.01.2010Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.02.2010  [2010/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 Quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/07]For all designated states
Renault S.A.S.
13-15 Quai Alfonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Grando, M. Thierry
3 Rue Marie Curie
92330 Sceaux / FR
02 / Letateley, M. Marcel
24 Rue du Marechal de Lattre de Tassigny
91460 Marcoussis / FR
 [2009/07]
Application number, filing date08300237.811.07.2008
[2009/07]
Priority number, dateFR2007000535123.07.2007         Original published format: FR 0705351
[2009/07]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2023117
Date:11.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01M15/02, G01M15/09, G01M15/10
[2009/07]
Designated contracting states(deleted) [2009/42]
Former [2009/07]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Leistungsüberlastung eines Einzylindermotors auf dem Prüfstand und entsprechende Vorrichtung[2009/07]
English:Method for supercharging a one-cylinder engine on a bench and corresponding device[2009/07]
French:Procede de suralimentation d'un moteur monocylindre sur banc et dispositif correspondant[2009/07]
Examination procedure12.08.2009Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2010/07]
17.09.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2010/07]
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2006190160  (MOSKWA JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * [Y] 2-6,10;
 [Y]EP1600622  (SEIBT KRISTL & CO GMBH [AT]) [Y] 2,3,10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0036]; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]FR2849110  (RENAULT SA [FR]) [Y] 4-6 * page 4, line 21 - page 7, line 21; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]DE19654137  (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 47; figure 1 *;
 [X]US2004103727  (ERLACH HANS [AT], et al) [X] 1,7-10 * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0123]; figures 1-13 *;
 [A]FR2837923  (SIEMENS VDO AUTOMOTIVE [FR]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *