Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028074

EP2028074 - Vehicle for conducting repairs along an overhead cable of a rope railway [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.04.2012
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip26.04.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 29.05.2013  [2013/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pomagalski
109, rue Aristide Bergès
38340 Voreppe / FR
[2011/25]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
POMAGALSKI
109, rue Aristide Bergès
38340 Voreppe / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Coudurier, Stéphane
2 rue Edouard Branly
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / Martin, Philippe
197 Allée de la Fontaine aux Merles
38340 Voreppe / FR
03 / Bonifat, Laurent
Chemin du Gay
38500 La Buisse / FR
04 / Tamisier, Franckie
139 Chemin du Clos
38330 Saint-Nazaire-Les-Eymes / FR
 [2009/09]
Representative(s)Hecké, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Hecké
10, rue d'Arménie - Europole
BP 1537
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Hecké, Gérard , et al
Cabinet Hecké World Trade Center - Europole 5, Place Robert Schuman BP 1537
38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR
Application number, filing date08354051.807.07.2008
[2009/09]
Priority number, dateFR2007000594020.08.2007         Original published format: FR 0705940
[2009/09]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028074
Date:25.02.2009
Language:FR
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028074
Date:22.06.2011
Language:FR
[2011/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:B61B7/04, B61B12/00, B61B12/02
[2009/09]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   IT,   LI [2009/44]
Former [2009/09]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Servicefahrzeug entlang eines Seils einer Seilbahnanlage[2009/09]
English:Vehicle for conducting repairs along an overhead cable of a rope railway[2009/09]
French:Véhicule d'intervention le long d'un câble aérien d'une installation de remontée mécanique[2009/09]
Examination procedure03.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
26.08.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
02.10.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
23.03.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.05.2011Fee for grant paid
07.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.03.2011
Opposition(s)23.03.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES03.10.2011
[2013/22]
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2575986  (CREISSELS DENIS [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 1-31 * * page 5, line 29 - page 6, line 4; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]EP0227540  (POMAGALSKI SA [FR]) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 13-48 * * column 3, line 12 - column 5, line 55; figures 3,4,7 *;
 [A]EP0710597  (GARAVENTA HOLDING AG [CH]) [A] 1,6,7 * page 2, lines 35-45 * * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 16; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0445612  (WAAGNER BIRO AG [AT]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantEP0227540