Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025623

EP2025623 - Waste container with electrostatically controlled cover [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kao, I-Feng
No. 6, Hsing-Ho 2nd Road An-Ping Industrial Park
Tainan / TW
For all designated states
Kao, Ming-Hung
No. 6, Hsing-Ho 2nd Road An-Ping Industrial Park
Tainan / TW
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/08]
Representative(s)Metz, Paul
Cabinet Metz Patni
1a Place Boecler
B.P. 10063
67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Metz, Paul
Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063
67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR
Former [2009/36]Metz, Paul
Cabinet Metz Patni 1a Place Boecler B.P. 10063
67024 Strasbourg Cedex 1 / FR
Former [2009/08]Metz, Paul
Cabinet METZ PATNI 1A place Boecler
67100 Strasbourg / FR
Application number, filing date08360014.830.05.2008
[2009/08]
Priority number, dateTW20070213459U15.08.2007         Original published format: TW 96213459 U
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2025623
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/08]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2025623
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:B65F1/16, // B65F1/06
[2009/08]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
TitleGerman:Müllbehälter mit elektrostatisch gesteuerter Abdeckung[2009/08]
English:Waste container with electrostatically controlled cover[2009/08]
French:Récipient de déchets avec couvercle commandé électrostatiquement[2009/08]
Examination procedure01.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
10.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.12.2011Fee for grant paid
17.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.10.2011
Opposition(s)09.11.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.03.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.05.2008
AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
LU30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
LU30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2014/21]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/35]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/33]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/23]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
FR31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/22]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/21]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
GB30.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/20]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IE30.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/07]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
CH31.05.2012
LI31.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/03]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
MC31.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/50]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/39]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT08.02.2012
NO08.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US6774586  (SHIH TSUNG-HWAN [TW]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 29 - column 4, line 17 * * figures 1-12 *;
 [A]US2006214620  (CHAN CHI T [CA]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-8 *