Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2179707

EP2179707 - Device for the treatment of female urinary incontinence and genital prolapse [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.09.2012
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.10.2012  [2012/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOENGINEERING LABORATORIES S.p.A.
Viale Cesare Cattaneo, 20
22063 Cantù (CO) / IT
[2010/17]
Inventor(s)01 / Salvatore, Stefano
Via Ciro Menotti 76
21000 Varese / IT
02 / Athanasiou, Stavros
Vass Sofias 54
11528 Athens / GR
03 / Cardozo, Linda
The Sloes
Potter St. Hill Pinner Mddx HA5 3XH / GB
04 / Greco, Francesco
C/o Bioengineering Laboratories S.p.A. Viale Cesare Cattaneo, 20
22063 Cantù (CO) / IT
05 / Bongini, Paolo
C/o Bioengineering Laboratories S.p.A. Viale Cesare Cattaneo, 20
22063 Cantù (CO) / IT
 [2010/17]
Representative(s)Ferraiolo, Rossana , et al
Ferraiolo S.r.l.
Via Napo Torriani, 10
20124 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2010/17]Ferraiolo, Rossana , et al
Ferraiolo S.r.l., Via Napo Torriani, 10
20124 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date08425683.321.10.2008
[2010/17]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2179707
Date:28.04.2010
Language:EN
[2010/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.2009
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/00, A61B17/04
[2010/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/17]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von weiblicher Harninkontinenz und Genitalprolaps[2010/17]
English:Device for the treatment of female urinary incontinence and genital prolapse[2010/17]
French:Dispositif pour le traitement de l'incontinence urinaire et le prolapsus génital chez les femmes[2010/17]
Examination procedure11.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.10.2010Examination requested  [2010/48]
22.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.07.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/43]
05.06.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2012/43]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.03.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XA]US2007015953  (MACLEAN BRIAN [US]) [X] 1,7,9 * paragraphs [0034] , [0039] , [0040]; figures 1-4; claim 6 * [A] 2,4;
 [X]WO2006108145  (BOSTON SCIENT SCIMED INC [US]) [X] 1,5,7,9 * page 32, line 23 - page 34, line 13; figures 21A-21D; claim 10 *;
 [A]WO0145570  (DEXTERITY SURGICAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * page 39, line 24 - page 41, line 29; figures 23-29 *
by applicantUS7297102
 US2002099260
 US2007043255
 US2007015953
 WO2006108145