EP2219328 - A method for soft re-routing in ASON [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/33] | A METHOD FOR SOFT RE-ROUTING IN ASON | ||
[2014/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Faming ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2014/47] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
YANG, Faming ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2014/47] |
Former [2010/33] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 08700568.2 | 02.01.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008CN00008 | Priority number, date | CN20071124587 | 21.11.2007 Original published format: CN200710124587 | [2010/33] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009065279 | Date: | 28.05.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219328 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219328 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.05.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00, H04L12/701, H04L12/721, H04L12/707, H04L12/703, H04L12/26 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04L45/00 (EP,US);
H04L43/0811 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L45/62 (EP);
H04Q11/0062 (EP);
H04Q2011/0073 (EP);
H04Q2011/0081 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/04] | H04Q11/00 | ||
Former IPC [2010/33] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Soft-Rerouting in ASON | [2014/28] | English: | A method for soft re-routing in ASON | [2014/28] | French: | Procédé de reroutage conditionnel dans un réseau optique commuté automatique | [2014/28] |
Former [2010/33] | VERFAHREN ZUM SOFT-REROUTING BEI ASON | ||
Former [2010/33] | A METHOD FOR SOFT RE-ROUTING IN ASON | ||
Former [2010/33] | PROCÉDÉ DE REROUTAGE CONDITIONNEL DANS UN RÉSEAU OPTIQUE COMMUTÉ AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 21.06.2010 | Translation filed | 21.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 21.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 11.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.01.2008 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | IE | 02.01.2015 | LU | 02.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 02.01.2015 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 02.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1134999 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]); | [A]US2003043736 (GONDA RUMI SHERYAR [US]); | [A]CN1866806 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | EP1898584 [ ] (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | International search | [A]CN1520102 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1588890 (FENGHUO COMM SCIENCE & TECH [CN]); | [X]CN1710993 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]CN1710869 (GUANGDONG PROV TELECOMM CO LTD [CN]) | Examination | CN1710993K | CN1710993 | by applicant | CN1710993 |