Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2120656 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2120656



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 1087
08.10.2018 Communication of bibliographic data Opposition 2
08.10.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
08.10.2018 Communication to opponent concerning maintenance Opposition 4
08.10.2018 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 2
24.09.2018 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
23.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
07.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
06.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
06.08.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
27.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
25.07.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
23.07.2018 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 15
23.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
23.07.2018 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.06.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.06.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.06.2018 F3013 Oral Proccedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
28.06.2018 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 5
22.05.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.05.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.05.2018 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
22.05.2018 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
16.05.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
16.05.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
16.05.2018 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Appeal 1
26.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
03.04.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
27.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
27.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
26.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
26.03.2018 F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal Appeal 1
21.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.03.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proccedings: summons Appeal 2
21.03.2018 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 5
16.03.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.03.2018 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
21.12.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 1
20.11.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
14.11.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 1
21.06.2017 Request for change of opponent's representative Search / examination 2
16.06.2017 Request concerning representative opponent Search / examination 1
26.01.2017 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
13.05.2015 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.05.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 17
21.04.2015 Reply to appeal Appeal 17
08.04.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
11.02.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
09.02.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
09.02.2015 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
04.02.2015 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 2
13.01.2015 F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition Appeal 4
13.01.2015 F3348 Confirmation of withdrawal of the opposition by the respondent and former opponent Appeal 4
13.01.2015 Refund of fees Appeal 1
10.01.2015 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
08.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 1
08.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
08.01.2015 Withdrawal of an appeal Appeal 1
08.01.2015 Withdrawal of an opposition Appeal 1
13.10.2014 F3004 Communication of the Registry Appeal 1
13.10.2014 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
13.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
13.10.2014 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
06.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Appeal 1
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 7
06.10.2014 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
06.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 77
06.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 51
02.10.2014 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.10.2014 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 19
23.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
23.09.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Appeal 2
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 9
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 4
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 1
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 2
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 1
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 2
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 9
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Opposition 4
23.09.2014 Citation in opposition procedure Appeal 1
23.09.2014 Filing of a new opposition Appeal 6
23.09.2014 Intervention of the assumed infringer Appeal 50
23.09.2014 Intervention of the assumed infringer Opposition 50
23.09.2014 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
22.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
22.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
22.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
17.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 3
17.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
17.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 3
14.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
14.07.2014 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
04.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
04.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.07.2014 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
03.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.07.2014 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
03.07.2014 Processing of an appeal Appeal 2
20.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
11.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.06.2014 Communication of amended entries Opposition 2
02.06.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
30.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
28.05.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 4
27.05.2014 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Druckexemplar in opposition procedure Opposition 4
27.05.2014 Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition Opposition 10
27.05.2014 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
27.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Internal form - Opposition/addressees Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings Opposition 2
27.05.2014 Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure Opposition 1
27.05.2014 Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure Opposition 1
15.05.2014 Information about the result of oral proceedings Opposition 1
07.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 2
06.05.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
06.05.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 13
25.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
22.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 19
17.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
17.04.2014 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
17.04.2014 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
15.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
15.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.04.2014 Request for change of opponent's representative Opposition 1
11.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
11.04.2014 Claims Opposition 2
11.04.2014 Claims Opposition 1
11.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
11.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
10.04.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 15
10.04.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.04.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Authorisation of representative Opposition 1
25.03.2014 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
14.03.2014 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
12.03.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 3
12.03.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.03.2014 Request for interpreters during oral proceedings Opposition 1
22.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.02.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
24.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
17.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
17.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
15.01.2014 Advice of delivery Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Annex to the communication - opposition Opposition 2
14.01.2014 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 3
14.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
14.01.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.01.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 2
23.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
23.05.2013 Brief communication - Opposition proceedings Opposition 1
17.05.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
13.05.2013 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 11
14.01.2013 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
14.01.2013 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
10.12.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
03.12.2012 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
29.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
29.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 19
29.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
29.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
29.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
29.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
29.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
29.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 28
28.11.2012 (Electronic) Receipt Opposition 2
28.11.2012 Claims Opposition 1
28.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 16
28.11.2012 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 19
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
28.11.2012 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 15
02.02.2012 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
16.01.2012 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2011 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
23.11.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
23.11.2011 French translation of claims Search / examination 2
27.07.2011 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
27.07.2011 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 4
27.07.2011 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
27.07.2011 Text intended for grant Search / examination 9
30.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
30.06.2011 Description Search / examination 2
30.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
20.06.2011 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2011 Description Search / examination 2
20.06.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
18.04.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
12.04.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
28.12.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
17.12.2010 Annex to the communication Search / examination 1
17.12.2010 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
26.01.2010 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.11.2009 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
10.11.2009 Priority document Search / examination 14
28.10.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
19.10.2009 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 1
02.10.2009 Reply by International Bureau Search / examination 2
22.09.2009 Enquiry with the International Bureau Search / examination 1
08.09.2009 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.08.2009 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.08.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
03.08.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
29.07.2009 Refund order of filing/examination fee Search / examination 1
01.07.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 6
25.05.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
04.08.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 13
17.07.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.07.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
17.07.2008 International publication of the A1 Pamphlet Search / examination 10
14.01.2008 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
14.01.2008 Claims PCT receiving Office 3
14.01.2008 Description PCT receiving Office 5
14.01.2008 Drawings PCT receiving Office 1