Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2130258

EP2130258 - FUEL CELL SYSTEM WITH ULTRASONIC DETECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/50]FUELL CELL SYSTEM WITH ULTRASONIC DETECTOR
[2011/04]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.06.2012
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
[2011/13]
Former [2009/50]For all designated states
Daimler AG
Mercedesstrasse 137
70327 Stuttgart / DE
For all designated states
Ford Global Technologies, LLC
330 Town Center Drive, Suite 800 South
Dearborn, MI 48126 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KNOOP, Andreas
Mittlere Beutau 71
73728 Esslingen / DE
 [2009/50]
Representative(s)JENSEN & SON
366-368 Old Street
London EC1V 9LT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2011/31]JENSEN & SON
366-368 Old Street London
EC1V 9LT / GB
Former [2011/27]JENSEN & SON
366-368 Old Street London
EC1V 9LT / GB
Former [2011/13](deleted)
...
Former [2010/15]Stückrad, Björn
Daimler AG Intellectual Property Management HPC U800
70546 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date08701129.216.01.2008
[2009/50]
WO2008EP00283
Priority number, dateDE2007100393826.01.2007         Original published format: DE102007003938
[2009/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008089903
Date:31.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2130258
Date:09.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008
[2009/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2130258
Date:03.08.2011
Language:EN
[2011/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:H01M8/04
[2009/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/50]
TitleGerman:BRENNSTOFFZELLENSYSTEM MIT ULTRASCHALLDETEKTOR[2009/50]
English:FUEL CELL SYSTEM WITH ULTRASONIC DETECTOR[2011/04]
French:SYSTÈME DE PILE À COMBUSTIBLE AVEC DÉTECTEUR À ULTRASONS[2009/50]
Former [2009/50]FUELL CELL SYSTEM WITH ULTRASONIC DETECTOR
Entry into regional phase15.07.2009National basic fee paid 
15.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.10.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time
24.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/50]
19.01.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.2011Fee for grant paid
11.05.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  19.01.2011
Opposition(s)04.05.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
24.10.2009Request for further processing filed
24.10.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU16.01.2008
AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
MT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
LU16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
MT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
LU16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2014/21]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
MT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
TR03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/35]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
MT03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
BG03.11.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/22]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
ES14.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/08]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
IE16.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/49]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/37]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/34]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
DK03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/23]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
EE03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
IT03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
RO03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
SK03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/21]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
CZ03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/17]AT03.08.2011
BE03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Former [2012/13]AT03.08.2011
CY03.08.2011
FI03.08.2011
HR03.08.2011
LT03.08.2011
LV03.08.2011
NL03.08.2011
PL03.08.2011
SE03.08.2011
SI03.08.2011
NO03.11.2011
GR04.11.2011
IS03.12.2011
PT05.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]US2005008910  (LEE JONG HYUN [KR]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0066] *;
 [A]US2005214603  (BARTON RUSSELL H [CA] ET AL) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0036] *;
 [A]DE19944047  (WAGNER GEORG F [DE] SCHUBERT & SALZER CONTROL SYST [DE]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB2257255  (HYCONTROL TECHNOLOGY LIMITED [GB]) [A] * page 1, line 5 * * page 1, line 19 - line 20 * * page 6, line 20 - line 24 * * page 7, line 2 - line 4 * * page 7, line 20 - line 23 * * page 8, line 15 - line 25 *;
 [A]EP1722433  (YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0064] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0088] *