Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2106537

EP2106537 - A SPECTROMETER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.01.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Valtion Teknillinen Tutkimuskeskus
Vuorimiehentie 3
02150 Espoo / FI
[2009/41]
Inventor(s)01 / SAARI, Heikki
Paalukuja 8
FI-02620 Espoo / FI
 [2009/41]
Representative(s)Seppo Laine Oy
Porkkalankatu 24
00180 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2014/29]Seppo Laine Oy
Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Former [2009/41]Lipsanen, Jari Seppo Einari
Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B
00180 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date08701723.223.01.2008
[2009/41]
WO2008FI50023
Priority number, dateGB2007000153626.01.2007         Original published format: GB 0701536
[2009/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008090261
Date:31.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2106537
Date:07.10.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008
[2009/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:FI31.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2013
ClassificationInternational:G01J3/26, G01N21/17, G01N21/64, G01J3/10
[2013/49]
Former International [2009/41]G01J3/26, G01N21/17, G01N21/64
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/41]
TitleGerman:SPEKTROMETER UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DES SPEKTROMETERS[2009/41]
English:A SPECTROMETER AND A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING THE SPECTROMETER[2009/41]
French:SPECTROMÈTRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMANDER LE SPECTROMÈTRE[2009/41]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2009National basic fee paid 
09.07.2009Search fee paid 
09.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/41]
30.04.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.01.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
25.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
28.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
13.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
23.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201407   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2014
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2005038418  (AXSUN TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 3 * * page 6 - page 7 * * figure 1A *;
 [Y]US2005243312  (GESHWIND FRANK [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * paragraphs [0140] , [ 141] *
International search[A]US2006116562  (ACOSTA GEORGE M [US], et al);
 [A]US2005264808  (WANG XIAOMEI [US]);
 [A]US5208651  (BUICAN TUDOR N [US]);
 [A]US5886247  (RABBETT MICHAEL DAVID [GB]);
 [A]US2006072112  (FLANDERS DALE C [US], et al);
 [A]US5026992  (WONG JACOB Y [US]);
 [A]US4839614  (HILL GODFREY R [GB], et al)