Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2111447

EP2111447 - Method for isolating a human stem cell from the full depth of the cartilage tissue [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/44]CONNECTIVE TISSUE REPAIR
[2012/18]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.09.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IS
published on 03.08.2016  [2016/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University College Cardiff Consultants Limited
30-36 Newport Road
Cardiff CF24 0DE / GB
[2009/44]
Inventor(s)01 / ARCHER, Charles, William
Fairfield House
Brondeg Terrace
Aberdare CF44 7PL / GB
02 / HAVEN, Samantha, Nichola
36 Fisher Hill Way
Radyr
Cardiff CF15 8DR / GB
03 / DOWTHWAITE, Gary
5 Lodwick Rise
St Mellons
Cardiff CF3 0NY / GB
 [2012/46]
Former [2009/44]01 / ARCHER, Charles, William
Fairfield House Brondeg Terrace
Aberdare CF44 7PL / GB
02 / HAVEN, Samantha, Nichola
36 Fisher Hill Way Radyr
Cardiff CF15 8DR / GB
03 / DOWTHWAITE, Gary
5 Lodwick Rise St Mellons
Cardiff CF3 0NY / GB
Representative(s)Myint, Julie Marie , et al
Symbiosis IP Limited
P.O. Box 246
Broadway
Worcestershire WR11 9AG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2010/47]Fyles, Julie Marie , et al
Symbiosis IP Limited P.O. Box 246 Broadway
Worcestershire WR11 9AG / GB
Former [2010/33]Fyles, Julie Marie , et al
Symbiosis IP Ltd. Marlborough House, Westminster Place York
YO26 6RW / GB
Former [2009/44]Fyles, Julie Marie
Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Temple Court 13A Cathedral Road Cardiff
CF11 9HA / GB
Application number, filing date08702053.306.02.2008
[2009/44]
WO2008GB00393
Priority number, dateGB2007000240108.02.2007         Original published format: GB 0702401
[2009/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008096118
Date:14.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2111447
Date:28.10.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008
[2009/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2111447
Date:14.11.2012
Language:EN
[2012/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:C12N5/077, A61L27/38
[2012/18]
Former International [2009/44]C12N5/08, A61L27/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/44]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Isolieren eines humanen Stammzellen aus der vollen Tiefe des Knorpelgewebes[2012/18]
English:Method for isolating a human stem cell from the full depth of the cartilage tissue[2012/18]
French:Procédé pour isoler une cellule souche humaine, de la profondeur totale du tissu cartilagineux[2012/18]
Former [2009/44]BINDEGEWEBSREPARATUR
Former [2009/44]CONNECTIVE TISSUE REPAIR
Former [2009/44]RÉPARATION DU TISSU CONJONCTIF
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase02.09.2009National basic fee paid 
02.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/44]
09.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.06.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.10.2012Fee for grant paid
03.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11158817.4  / EP2392361
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.12.2009
Opposition(s)15.08.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.02.2008
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
IS14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
IE06.02.2013
LU06.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
[2016/31]
Former [2015/34]HU06.02.2008
AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
IE06.02.2013
LU06.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2015/32]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
TR14.11.2012
IE06.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2014/32]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
MT14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
IE06.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2014/07]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
IE06.02.2013
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/48]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/42]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/37]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
NL14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
RO14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/35]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
CZ14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
EE14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
SK14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/34]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
DK14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
BG14.02.2013
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/31]AT14.11.2012
BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/28]BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
PT14.03.2013
Former [2013/27]BE14.11.2012
CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
Former [2013/26]CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
SI14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
Former [2013/24]CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
GR15.02.2013
Former [2013/23]CY14.11.2012
FI14.11.2012
HR14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
LV14.11.2012
PL14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Former [2013/22]FI14.11.2012
LT14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Former [2013/21]LT14.11.2012
SE14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Former [2013/20]LT14.11.2012
NO14.02.2013
Cited inInternational search[X]  - SU W ET AL, "Cartilage-derived stromal cells: Is it a novel cell resource for cell therapy to regenerate infarcted myocardium?", STEM CELLS 200602 US, (200602), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 349 - 356, XP002478825 [X] 1-8,14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2005-0168
 [X]  - ALSALAMEH SAIFEDDIN ET AL, "Identification of mesenchymal progenitor cells in normal and osteoarthritic human articular cartilage.", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM MAY 2004, (200405), vol. 50, no. 5, ISSN 0004-3591, pages 1522 - 1532, XP002478826 [X] 1-8,14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.20269
 [X]  - FICKERT STEFAN ET AL, "Identification of subpopulations with characteristics of mesenchymal progenitor cells from human osteoarthritic cartilage using triple staining for cell surface markers.", ARTHRITIS RESEARCH & THERAPY 2004, (2004), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 1478-6362, pages R422 - R432, XP002478827 [X] 1-8,14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/ar1210
 [X]  - HENG B C ET AL, "Directing stem cell differentiation into the chondrogenic lineage in vitro", STEM CELLS, ALPHAMED PRESS, DAYTON, OH, US, (20040101), vol. 22, no. 7, ISSN 1066-5099, pages 1152 - 1167, XP002369108 [X] 1-8,14 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1634/stemcells.2004-0062
 [A]  - DOWTHWAITE GARY P ET AL, "The surface of articular cartilage contains a progenitor cell population.", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, (20040229), vol. 117, no. 6, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 889 - 897, XP002478828 [A] 1-14 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.00912
by applicantUS2006239980
    - ARCHER C, FRANCIS-WEST P, "The chondrocyte", INT. J BIOCHEM CELL BIOL., (2003), vol. 35, pages 401 - 404
    - BRITTBERG, M, LINDAHL, A, NILSSON, A, OHLSSON, C, ISAKSSIN, 0, PETERSON, L., "Treatment of deep cartilage defects in the knee with autologous chondrocyte transplantation", N ENGL J MED., (1994), vol. 331, pages 889 - 895
    - DOWTHWAITE, GP, FLANNERY, CR, LEWTHWAITE, J, FLANNELLY, J, ARCHER, CW, PITSILLIDES AA., "A mechanism underlying the movement requirement for synovial joint cavitation", MATRIX BIOL., (2003), vol. 22, pages 311 - 322
    - DOWTHWAITE, GP, BISHOP JC, REDMAN SN, KHAN IM, ROONEY P, EVANS DJ, HAUGHTON L, BAYRAM Z, BOYER S, THOMSON B, "The surface of articular cartilage contains a progenitor cell population", J CELL SCI., (2004), vol. 117, doi:doi:10.1242/jcs.00912, pages 889 - 897, XP002478828

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.00912
    - FLANNERY CR, HUGHES CE, SCHUMACHER BL, TUDOR D, AYDELOTTE MB, KUETTNER KE, CATERSON B., "Articular cartilage superficial zone protein (SZP) is homologous to megakaryocyte stimulating factor precursor and Is a multifunctional proteoglycan with potential growth-promoting, cytoprotective, and lubricating properties in cartilage metabolism", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN., (1999), vol. 254, doi:doi:10.1006/bbrc.1998.0104, pages 535 - 41, XP002168598

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1998.0104
    - HAYES, AJ, MACPHERSON, S, MORRISON, H, DOWTHWAITE, GP, ARCHER, CW, "The development of articular cartilage: evidence for an appositional growth mechanism", ANAT EMBRYOL., (2001), vol. 203, pages 469 - 79
    - KNUDSON CB, "Hyaluronan and CD44: strategic players for cell- matrix interactions during chondrogenesis and matrix assembly", BIRTH DEFECTS RES C EMBRYO TODAY, (2003), vol. 69, pages 174 - 96