Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2240673

EP2240673 - METHOD FOR REDUCING DIESEL ENGINE EMISSIONS, AND DIESEL ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.05.2016
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mack Trucks, Inc.
7900 National Service Road
Greensboro, NC 27409 / US
[2010/42]
Inventor(s)01 / GIBBLE, John, C.
2443 Rogers Drive
Greencastle PA 17225 / US
02 / SUDER, Timothy
6980 Warm Spring Road
Greencastle PA 17225 / US
 [2010/42]
Representative(s)Valea AB
Box 1098
405 23 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [2010/42]Fröhling, Werner Otto , et al
Volvo Technology Corporation Corporate Patents 06820, M1.7
405 08 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date08705768.308.01.2008
[2010/42]
WO2008US50466
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009088506
Date:16.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2240673
Date:20.10.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009
[2010/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US16.07.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.11.2011
ClassificationInternational:F02B57/00, F02B41/10, F02M25/07, F02D23/02, F02B37/24, F02D41/00, F02D41/14
[2011/50]
Former International [2010/42]F02B57/00, F02B41/10, F02M25/07
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/42]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON DIESELMOTOREMISSIONEN UND DIESELMOTOR[2010/42]
English:METHOD FOR REDUCING DIESEL ENGINE EMISSIONS, AND DIESEL ENGINE[2010/42]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DES REJETS D'UN MOTEUR DIESEL ET MOTEUR DIESEL[2010/42]
Entry into regional phase09.08.2010National basic fee paid 
09.08.2010Search fee paid 
09.08.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
09.08.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.08.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
09.08.2010Examination requested  [2010/42]
05.06.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.01.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.05.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2017Date of oral proceedings
23.02.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.02.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination18.04.2017Appeal received No.  T1547/17
09.06.2017Statement of grounds filed
05.08.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2015
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
31.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
31.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
31.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
31.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
02.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
20.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
17.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
16.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
09.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2007136142  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; MURATA HIROKI [JP]) [X] 1-15 * page 6, line 5 - page 10, line 7; figures 1,2a,2b *;
 [X]US2007271918  (NISHIYAMA TOSHIHIKO [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0098]; figures 1-6 *;
 [X]WO2007107865  (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]; NAGAE MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0081]; figures 1,2,3a,3b *;
 [X]WO2007076038  (BORG WARNER INC [US]; SHUTTY JOHN [US]; JOERGL VOLKER [US]; MUELLER VO) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] *
International search[X]US6625985  (SHIRAKAWA);
 [Y]US5934263  (RUSS ET AL.);
 [Y]US7237381  (KOLAVENNU ET AL.)