Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2074860

EP2074860 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING ADDRESS PREFIX INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH HANDOVER IN NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.05.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.02.2019Deletion: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / XIA, Yangsong
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzen, Guangdong / CN
02 / SARIKAYA, Behcet
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzen, Guangdong / CN
 [2012/50]
Former [2009/27]01 / XIA, Yangsong
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzen, Guangdong / CN
02 / SARIKAYA, Behcet
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzen, Guangdong / CN
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2012/50]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Former [2009/35]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Former [2009/27]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date08706692.418.02.2008
[2009/27]
WO2008CN70319
Priority number, dateUS20070890318P16.02.2007         Original published format: US 890318 P
US20070940019P24.05.2007         Original published format: US 940019 P
US20070946719P27.06.2007         Original published format: US 946719 P
US2008002284530.01.2008         Original published format: US 22845
[2009/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008101442
Date:28.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2074860
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008
[2009/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2074860
Date:19.06.2013
Language:EN
[2013/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN28.08.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2010
ClassificationInternational:H04W8/26, H04L29/12
[2012/29]
Former International [2009/27]H04Q7/38, H04L12/28, H04L12/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/27]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR VERWALTUNG VON ADRESSENPRÄFIXINFORMATION VERBUNDEN MIT HANDOVER IN NETZEN[2009/27]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING ADDRESS PREFIX INFORMATION ASSOCIATED WITH HANDOVER IN NETWORKS[2009/27]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE GESTION DE L'INFORMATION DE PRÉFIXE D'ADRESSE ASSOCIÉE AU TRANSFERT DANS LES RÉSEAUX[2009/27]
Entry into regional phase30.04.2009National basic fee paid 
30.04.2009Search fee paid 
30.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
30.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
04.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.10.2012Fee for grant paid
24.10.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)EP12191350.3  / EP2566203
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  07.03.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  07.07.2016  WITHDRAWN
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
Kribber, Klaus-Dieter
Ericsson GmbH
Ericsson Allee 1
52134 Herzogenrath / DE
 [2016/33]
Former [2014/18]
Opponent(s)01  19.03.2014  26.03.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
25.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.11.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
30.07.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.04.2016
10.09.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.02.2016
17.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
07.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
22.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
03.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
03.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition26.07.2016Appeal received No.  T1758/16
13.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.01.2013Statement of grounds filed
25.01.2013Appeal received
27.02.2013Interlocutory revision of appeal
13.08.2015Result of appeal procedure: other kind of disposal
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
30.04.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201306   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2013
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.02.2008
BE19.06.2013
BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
GR19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IS19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
PT19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
LU18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
[2017/48]
Former [2017/17]HU18.02.2008
BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
GR19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IS19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
PT19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
LU18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2016/33]HU18.02.2008
BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
GR19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IS19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
PT19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
TR19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
LU18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/32]HU18.02.2008
BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
GR19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
IS19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
PT19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/31]BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
GR19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
PT19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/30]BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
PT19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/29]BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
AT28.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/25]BG19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/21]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
NO19.09.2013
IE18.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
IT18.02.2015
Former [2016/12]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE18.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2015/07]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
IE18.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/24]CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
Former [2014/21]IT12.12.2012
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
Former [2014/14]IT12.12.2012
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
NL19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
Former [2014/11]IT12.12.2012
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
PL19.06.2013
RO19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
Former [2014/10]IT12.12.2012
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
Former [2014/03]IT12.12.2012
CY19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
Former [2014/02]CY19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
Former [2013/52]CY19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
Former [2013/51]FI19.06.2013
HR19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
Former [2013/49]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1684470  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0024] - [0036]; figure 3 *;
 [A]EP1679834  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0050] - [0070]; figure 1 *
 [X]  - YOKOTA KDDI R&D LABORATORIES H ET AL, "Mobile IPv6 Fast Handovers for 3G CDMA Networks; draft-ietf-mipshop-3gfh-01.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20061023), vol. mipshop, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015047946 [X] 1-16 * pages 10-17 *
 [A]  - HEEJIN JANG SAMSUNG AIT JUNGHOON JEE ETRI YOUN-HEE HAN KUT SOOHONG DANIEL PARK SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS JAESUN CHA ETRI, "Mobile IPv6 Fast Handovers over IEEE 802.16e Networks; draft-ietf-mipshop-fh80216e-01.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20070102), vol. mipshop, no. 1, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015049574 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[X]CN1543256  ;
 [X]CN1879365  ;
 [X]CN1875579  ;
 [A]CN1484407  ;
 [A]KR100694302B  ;
 [A]KR20070061296
 [X]  - RAJEEV KOODLI ET AL., "Fast Handovers for Mobile IPv6 draft-ietf-mobileip-fast-mipv6-08.txt", (20031010), pages 8 - 14, 32, XP008106232