Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2124636

EP2124636 - NOVEL USE OF (-)-EPIGALLOCATECHIN GALLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.02.2014
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.03.2014  [2014/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[2009/49]
Former [2009/38]For all designated states
DSM IP Assets B.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / RAEDERSTORFF, Daniel
5, rue Etienne Bilger
F-68720 Flaxlanden / FR
02 / STIEFEL, Anna-Maria
Aufstiegweg 7
CH-4153 Reinach / CH
03 / WOLFRAM, Swen
Am Buchenhain 24
79761 Waldshut-Tiengen / DE
 [2009/49]
Representative(s)Rabanus, Birgit , et al
DSM Nutritional Products AG
Patent Department
Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
[2012/33]
Former [2009/49]Rabanus, Birgit
DSM Nutritional Products Ltd NBD/BP Wurmisweg 576
4303 Kaiseraugst / CH
Application number, filing date08707102.317.01.2008
[2009/49]
WO2008EP00337
Priority number, dateEP2007000214401.02.2007         Original published format: EP 07002144
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008092573
Date:07.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2124636
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008
[2009/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP07.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:A23L1/30, A61K31/355
[2009/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:NEUE VERWENDUNG VON (-)-EPIGALLOCATECHINGALLAT[2009/49]
English:NOVEL USE OF (-)-EPIGALLOCATECHIN GALLATE[2009/49]
French:NOUVELLE UTILISATION D'ÉPIGALLOCATÉCHINE GALLATE[2009/49]
Entry into regional phase09.07.2009National basic fee paid 
09.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
04.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2012Observations by third parties
08.04.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
18.10.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/13]
15.11.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/13]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  04.06.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004037018  (NEW SUN NUTRITION COMPANY [US]; LINES THOMAS CHRISTIAN [LU]; ONO MITSU) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10-12 * page 1, line 25 - page 3, line 32; example 2; claim 6 * * page 4, lines 24-32 *;
 [X]WO2006131326  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]; RAEDERSTORFF DANIEL [FR]; RIEGGER CHRISTOPH [CH) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10-12 * claims 18,19,32 *;
 [X]JP2005225804  (KAO CORP) [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10,12 * abstract *;
 [X]WO2005014020  (INTERHEALTH NUTRACEUTICALS INC [US]) [X] 3,6,10-12 * page 1, lines 5-11; claim 1 * * page 3, lines 9-14 * * page 4, lines 23-28 *;
 [A]US2004116351  (HALEVIE-GOLDMAN BRIAN D [US]) [A] 1-10,12 * page 1, paragraphs 1,3; claims 1,3,17,25,39 *
 [X]  - MURASE TAKATOSHI ET AL, "Green tea extract improves running endurance in mice by stimulating lipid utilization during exercise.", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY. REGULATORY, INTEGRATIVE AND COMPARATIVE PHYSIOLOGY JUN 2006, (200606), vol. 290, no. 6, ISSN 0363-6119, pages R1550 - R1556, XP008080359 [X] 1-12 * page R1550, paragraphs 1,2,4 - page R1551, paragraph 3 * * page R1552, paragraphs 3-5,8-10; figures 1,4-6 * * page R1554, paragraph 2 - page R1555, paragraph 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpregu.00752.2005
 [X]  - MURASE TAKATOSHI ET AL, "GREEN TEA EXTRACT IMPROVES ENDURANCE CAPACITY AND INCREASES MUSCLE LIPID OXIDATION IN MICE", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: REGULATORY, INTEGRATIVE AND COMPARATIVE PHYSIOLOGY, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, US, (20041124), vol. 288, no. 3, ISSN 0363-6119, pages R708 - R715, XP008072860 [X] 1-12 * page R708, paragraphs 1-6 * * page R709, paragraphs 2-5; figure 1 * * page R711, paragraph 5 - page R712, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/ajpregu.00693.2004
 [X]  - HAYASHI E ET AL, "PHARMACOLOGICAL ACTION OF TEA EXTRACT ON THE CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM IN MICE", OYO YAKURI - PHARMACOMETRICS, XX, XX, (1990), vol. 40, no. 3, ISSN 0300-8533, pages 351 - 358, XP008072037 [X] 1,3,4,6-8,10,12 * abstract *
other   - "Chai", TKDL, Database accession no. AN2/324, XP003026894
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Khazaain-al-Advia, (1911), vol. II, pages 342 - 343
    - "Chayam Guna", TKDL, Database accession no. VJ/631, XP003029251
    - PRIYAVRATA SHARMA, Priyanighantu, (2004), page 224
    - "Habb-e-chai", TKDL, Database accession no. NA4/3924, XP003029252
    - MOHAMMAD NAJMUL GHANI KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Najm-al-Ghani, (1928), page 594