Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2115527

EP2115527 - METHOD FOR OPTIMISING A SPECTACLE LENS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.05.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.06.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.07.2018  [2018/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rodenstock GmbH
Elsenheimerstrasse 33
80687 München / DE
[2012/48]
Former [2009/46]For all designated states
Rodenstock GmbH
Isartalstrasse 43
80469 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / ESSER, Gregor
Madelsederstrasse 1
81735 München / DE
02 / BECKEN, Wolfgang
Werinherstrasse 28
81541 München / DE
03 / ALTHEIMER, Helmut
An der Halde 2
87650 Baisweil-Lauchdorf / DE
04 / SEIDEMANN, Anne
Lindwurmstrasse 42
80337 München / DE
05 / UTTENWEILER, Dietmar
Walchstadter Strasse 25
82057 Icking / DE
06 / MÜLLER, Werner
Waldstrasse 17
75443 Ötisheim / DE
07 / WEHNER, Edda
Josef-Hebel-Strasse 31
82275 Emmering / DE
 [2009/46]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/16]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
Former [2009/46]Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte
Grafinger Strasse 2
81671 München / DE
Application number, filing date08707297.125.01.2008
[2009/46]
WO2008EP00588
Priority number, dateDE2007100385725.01.2007         Original published format: DE102007003857
[2009/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008089999
Date:31.07.2008
Language:DE
[2008/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2115527
Date:11.11.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.2008
[2009/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2115527
Date:16.04.2014
Language:DE
[2014/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP31.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:G02C7/02
[2009/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/46]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG EINES BRILLENGLASES[2009/46]
English:METHOD FOR OPTIMISING A SPECTACLE LENS[2009/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ D'OPTIMISATION D'UN VERRE DE LUNETTES[2009/46]
Entry into regional phase20.08.2009National basic fee paid 
20.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
10.03.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.06.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.07.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.09.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
08.11.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.03.2014Fee for grant paid
06.03.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.01.2015  23.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
20103 Hamburg / DE
 [2018/27]
Former [2017/06]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2015  23.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 13 03 91
DE-20103 Hamburg / DE
Former [2015/17]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2015  23.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Wolf, Pfiz & Gauss Patentanwälte
Hauptmannsreute 93
70193 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2015/10]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2015  23.01.2015  ADMISSIBLE
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
Opponent's representative
Gauss, Nikolai
Wolf Pfiz & Gauss
Patentanwälte
Hauptmannsreute 93
DE-70193 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  16.01.2015   
Carl Zeiss Vision International GmbH
Gartenstrasse 97
73430 Aalen / DE
23.02.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
18.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
28.03.2017Date of oral proceedings
10.05.2017Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition02.06.2017Appeal received No.  T1747/17
20.09.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
17.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
17.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
13.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU25.01.2008
CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
TR16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
[2017/40]
Former [2017/03]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
MT16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/25]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
AT25.01.2015
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2016/07]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
IE25.01.2015
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/47]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
CH31.01.2015
LI31.01.2015
Former [2015/43]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
MC16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/39]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
LU25.01.2015
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/36]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SI16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/30]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
BE31.01.2015
Former [2015/11]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
RO16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/10]CY16.04.2014
CZ16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
EE16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
SK16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/08]CY16.04.2014
DK16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2015/02]CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
PT18.08.2014
Former [2014/50]CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
HR16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
LV16.04.2014
NL16.04.2014
PL16.04.2014
SE16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
GR17.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/49]CY16.04.2014
FI16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
NO16.07.2014
IS16.08.2014
Former [2014/48]CY16.04.2014
LT16.04.2014
BG16.07.2014
Former [2014/47]CY16.04.2014
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO0192948  (INRAY LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,21,23-25 * page 9, line 28 - page 14, line 22; figure 2 * [Y] 7,13-20,22;
 [XY]DE10313275  (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027] * [Y] 7;
 [Y]WO0184213  (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE], et al) [Y] 13 * page 5, paragraph 3 *;
 [Y]WO02088830  (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 14-20,22 * page 18, line 2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 *;
 [PX]DE102006030204  (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-12,23-25 * the whole document *;
 [PX]DE102005057533  (RODENSTOCK GMBH [DE]) [PX] 1-12,23-25 * the whole document *
by applicantWO0192948
 DE10313275
 WO0184213