Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2114673

EP2114673 - SECURITY DOCUMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
12.11.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
[2009/46]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHILLING, Andreas
Flurstrasse 20
CH-6332 Hagendorn (ZG) / CH
02 / TOMPKIN, Wayne, Robert
Oesterliwaldweg 2
CH-5400 Baden / CH
03 / STAUB, René
Hofmatt 24
CH-6332 Hagendorn / CH
 [2009/46]
Representative(s)Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/46]Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, P.O. Box 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date08707586.707.02.2008
[2009/46]
WO2008EP00924
Priority number, dateDE2007100588407.02.2007         Original published format: DE102007005884
[2009/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008095696
Date:14.08.2008
Language:DE
[2008/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2114673
Date:11.11.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008
[2009/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2114673
Date:23.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:B32B29/00, D21H21/44
[2009/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/46]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT[2009/46]
English:SECURITY DOCUMENT[2009/46]
French:DOCUMENT DE SÉCURITÉ[2009/46]
Entry into regional phase06.08.2009National basic fee paid 
06.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.12.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
08.10.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.2011Fee for grant paid
03.02.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 [2017/42]
Former [2012/05]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
02.02.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.07.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.02.2015Date of oral proceedings
04.03.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
04.03.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition29.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0915/15
03.07.2015Statement of grounds filed
26.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
EE23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
IE23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
RO23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
SK23.03.2011
TR23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
PT25.07.2011
LU07.02.2012
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/27]
Former [2014/21]CY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
EE23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
IE23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
RO23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
SK23.03.2011
TR23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
PT25.07.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/35]CY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
EE23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
IE23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
RO23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
SK23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
PT25.07.2011
BE28.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2011/50]CY23.03.2011
EE23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
RO23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
SK23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
PT25.07.2011
Former [2011/49]CY23.03.2011
EE23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
RO23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
SK23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
PT25.07.2011
Former [2011/47]CY23.03.2011
EE23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
PT25.07.2011
Former [2011/37]CY23.03.2011
FI23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
SI23.03.2011
BG23.06.2011
NO23.06.2011
GR24.06.2011
Former [2011/36]HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
GR24.06.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2005106118  (RUE DE INT LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-37 * page 1, line 3 - line 23 * * page 7 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 12 * * page 10, line 23 - page 12, line 22 * * page 11, line 11 - line 24 * * page 16, line 19 - page 17, line 2 * * page 18, line 1 - line 2 * * page 20, line 5 - page 22, line 16 * * page 25, line 17 - line 20 * * figures 1-7; claim 21 *;
 [X]EP0628408  (ANDRIC DRAGISA [YU], et al) [X] 1-37 * page 4, line 41 - page 7, line 41 *;
 [DX]DE19739193  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1-37 * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 37 * * column 2, line 36 - column 4, line 37 *