Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2121320

EP2121320 - SECURITY ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.02.2011
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.09.2017Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 04.10.2017  [2017/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Leonhard Kurz Stiftung & Co. KG
Schwabacher Strasse 482
90763 Fürth / DE
[2009/48]
Inventor(s)01 / SCHILLING, Andreas
Flurstrasse 20
CH-6332 Hagendorn / CH
 [2009/48]
Representative(s)Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis, Pöhlau, Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/48]Zinsinger, Norbert
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz, P.O. Box 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date08707598.207.02.2008
[2009/48]
WO2008EP00941
Priority number, dateDE2007100588407.02.2007         Original published format: DE102007005884
DE2007105765828.11.2007         Original published format: DE102007057658
[2009/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008095706
Date:14.08.2008
Language:DE
[2008/33]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2121320
Date:25.11.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008
[2009/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2121320
Date:23.03.2011
Language:DE
[2011/12]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:B32B29/00, D21H21/44
[2009/48]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/48]
TitleGerman:SICHERHEITSELEMENT[2009/48]
English:SECURITY ELEMENT[2009/48]
French:ÉLÉMENT DE SÉCURITÉ[2009/48]
Entry into regional phase03.08.2009National basic fee paid 
03.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
03.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.12.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
27.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.2011Fee for grant paid
24.01.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Giesecke+Devrient Currency Technology GmbH
Prinzregentenstraße 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY
32, Avenue Pierre Grenier
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Opponent's representative
Nony, et al
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
 [2017/40]
Former [2016/39]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY
32, Avenue Pierre Grenier
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Opponent's representative
Nony, et al
11 rue Saint-Georges
75009 Paris / FR
Former [2016/25]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY
32, Avenue Pierre Grenier
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Opponent's representative
Tanty, François, et al
Cabinet Nony
11, rue Saint-Georges
FR-75009 Paris / FR
Former [2016/07]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY
32, Avenue Pierre Grenier
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Opponent's representative
Tanty, François, et al
Cabinet Nony
3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
Former [2012/05]
Opponent(s)01  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GmbH
Prinzregentenstr. 159
81677 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Grimm, Christian, et al
Geyer, Fehners & Partner, Patentanwälte, Perhamerstrasse 31
80687 München / DE
 02  22.12.2011  29.12.2011  ADMISSIBLE
ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY
21-23 Boulevard Haussmann
75009 PARIS / FR
Opponent's representative
Tanty, François, et al
Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre
75008 Paris / FR
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
31.01.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
09.08.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
07.10.2015Date of oral proceedings
09.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
09.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition08.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0002/16
17.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
21.12.2015Appeal received No.  T0002/16
25.02.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.02.2008
CY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
TR23.03.2011
NO23.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
LU07.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]CY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
TR23.03.2011
NO23.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
LU07.02.2012
MC29.02.2012
Former [2014/21]CY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
TR23.03.2011
NO23.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
MC29.02.2012
Former [2013/35]CY23.03.2011
DK23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
MT23.03.2011
NO23.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
MC29.02.2012
Former [2011/52]CY23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
NO23.06.2011
IS23.07.2011
Former [2011/38]CY23.03.2011
HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
NO23.06.2011
Former [2011/36]HR23.03.2011
LT23.03.2011
LV23.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1674286  (ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY [FR], et al) [X] 1-31,40,42,43,46-48,50-54 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0014] , [0018] , [0019] , [0030] , [0031] , [0034] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0659936  (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-54 * the whole document *;
 [PX]FR2901812  (ARJOWIGGINS SECURITY SOC PAR A [FR]) [PX] 1,4,5,12,51,52,54 * page 1, line 20 - page 4, line 25 * * page 5, line 26 - page 8, line 18 * * figures 1-3 *