Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2115639

EP2115639 - INVOKING TAPERED PROMPTS IN A MULTIMODAL APPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nuance Communications, Inc.
One Wayside Road
Burlington, MA 01803 / US
[2009/46]
Inventor(s)01 / ATIVANICHAYAPHONG, Soonthorn
1210 Estates Ave, Apt 2332
Charlotte, NC 28209-0251 / US
02 / CROSS JR, Charles, Willard
11300 Mainsail Court
Wellington, FL 33467 / US
03 / MCCOBB, Gerald, Matthew
1153 Canoe Point
Delray Beach, FL 33444 / US
 [2009/50]
Former [2009/46]01 / ATIVANICHAYAPHONG, Soonthorn
3100 Millwood Terrace, M-102
Boca Raton, FL 33431 / US
02 / CROSS JR, Charles, Willard
11300 Mainsail Court
Wellington, FL 33467 / US
03 / MCCOBB, Gerald, Matthew
1153 Canoe Point
Delray Beach, FL 33444 / US
Representative(s)Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/46]Driver, Virginia Rozanne
Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Application number, filing date08708661.704.02.2008
[2009/46]
WO2008EP51358
Priority number, dateUS2007067892026.02.2007         Original published format: US 678920
[2009/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008104441
Date:04.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/36]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2115639
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008
[2009/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/30, H04M3/493
[2009/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/46]
TitleGerman:AUFRUFEN VON VERJÜNGTEN AUFFORDERUNGEN IN EINER MULTIMODALEN ANWENDUNG[2009/46]
English:INVOKING TAPERED PROMPTS IN A MULTIMODAL APPLICATION[2009/46]
French:APPEL D'INVITES TRONQUÉES DANS UNE APPLICATION MULTIMODE[2009/46]
Entry into regional phase27.08.2009National basic fee paid 
27.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
27.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
14.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.10.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
13.10.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination12.12.2016Appeal received No.  T0730/17
23.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
13.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.01.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
12.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
12.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
11.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
10.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
27.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
27.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[A]US2002147593  (LEWIS JAMES R [US] ET AL) [A] 1-8 * figure 1; claim 1 *
 [XY]  - AXELSSON J ET AL, "XHTML+Voice Profile 1.2", INTERNET, (20040316), pages 1 - 53, URL: http://www.voicexml.org/specs/multimodal/x+v/12/spec.html, (20080612), XP002484188 [X] 1-5,7,8 * paragraph [05.4] * * paragraphs [5.4.1] - [5.4.3] * [Y] 6
 [XY]  - W3C, "Voice Extensible Markup Languge (VoiceXML) Version 2.0", INTERNET CITATION, URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/voicexml20, (20030718), XP002248286 [X] 1,3,5-8 * paragraph [4.1.6] * * paragraph [4.1.4] * * paragraphs [4.1.2] , [4.1.3] * [Y] 6
 [A]  - W3C, "Voice Extensible Markup Language (VoiceXML) 2.1, W3C Candidate Recommendation 13 June 2005", INTERNET, (20050613), pages 1 - 34, URL: http://www.w3.org/TR/2005/CR-voicexml21-20050613/, (20080612), XP002484189 [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0003] *