Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2238592

EP2238592 - METHOD FOR REDUCING NOISE IN AN INPUT SIGNAL OF A HEARING DEVICE AS WELL AS A HEARING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  24.02.2012
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.01.2018Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 28.02.2018  [2018/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sonova AG
Laubisrütistrasse 28
8712 Stäfa / CH
[2015/38]
Former [2012/12]For all designated states
Phonak AG
Laubisrütistrasse 28
8712 Stäfa / CH
Former [2010/41]For all designated states
Phonak AG
Laubisrütistrasse 28
8712 Stäfa / CH
For all designated states
Korl, Sascha
Vordere Ferneggstrasse 3
8824 Schoenenberg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / DERLETH, Ralph Peter
Im Lenz 111
CH-8340 Hinwil / CH
02 / SCHUSTER, Guido
Weierstrasse 2e
CH-8712 Staefa / CH
03 / ANSORGE, Reto
1228 Oak Ave. Apt. 3
Evanston, Illinois 60202 / US
04 / GERBER, Res
Obere Heslibachstrasse 31
CH-8700 Kuesnacht / CH
05 / KORL, Sascha
Vorderer Ferneggstrasse 3
CH-8824 Schoenenberg / CH
 [2011/48]
Former [2010/41]01 / DERLETH, Ralph Peter
Im Lenz 111
CH-8340 Hinwil / CH
02 / SCHUSTER, Guido
Weierstrasse 2e
CH-8712 Staefa / CH
03 / ANSORGE, Reto
1228 Oak Ave. Apt. 3
Evanston, Illinois 60202 / US
04 / GERBER, Res
Obere Heslibachstrasse 31
CH-8700 Kuesnacht / CH
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
[2012/13]
Former [2010/41]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Schwäntenmos 14
8126 Zumikon / CH
Application number, filing date08708714.405.02.2008
[2010/41]
WO2008EP51417
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008104446
Date:04.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/36]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2238592
Date:13.10.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.09.2008
[2010/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2238592
Date:28.03.2012
Language:EN
[2012/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:G10L21/02, H04R3/00
[2011/39]
Former International [2010/41]G10L21/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/41]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON RAUSCHEN IN EINEM EINGANGSSIGNAL EINES HÖRGERÄTS SOWIE EIN HÖRGERÄT[2011/39]
English:METHOD FOR REDUCING NOISE IN AN INPUT SIGNAL OF A HEARING DEVICE AS WELL AS A HEARING DEVICE[2010/41]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DE BRUIT DANS UN SIGNAL D'ENTRÉE D'UN DISPOSITIF AUDITIF ET DISPOSITIF AUDITIF[2010/41]
Former [2010/41]VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON RAUSCHEN IN EINEM EINGANGSSIGNAL EINES HÖRGERÄTS SOWIE HÖRGERÄT
Entry into regional phase19.07.2010National basic fee paid 
19.07.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
19.07.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.2010Examination requested  [2010/41]
06.10.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.01.2012Fee for grant paid
16.01.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  06.10.2011
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  27.12.2012  14.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street
No. 08-08
18 Tai Seng
Singapore 539775 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
 [2018/09]
Former [2018/08]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2012  14.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
18 Tai Seng Street, No. 08-08
539775 Singapur / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2012  14.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Sivantos Pte. Ltd.
Block 28, Ayer Rajah Crescent, No 06-08
Singapur 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2015/22]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2012  14.01.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
FDST Patentanwälte
Nordostpark 16
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2013/06]
Opponent(s)01  27.12.2012   
Siemens Medical Instruments Pte. Ltd.
Block 28 Ayer Rajah Crescent No. 06-08
Singapore 139959 / SG
Opponent's representative
Niewalda, Gregor
SIEMENS AG CT IP Postfach 221634
80506 Munchen / DE
05.02.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
31.07.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.09.2015Date of oral proceedings
29.10.2015Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.10.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition20.11.2015Appeal received No.  T2222/15
08.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
15.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
15.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU05.02.2008
AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
GB05.02.2013
IE05.02.2013
LU05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
TR28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
GB05.02.2013
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/32]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
MT28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
GB05.02.2013
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/09]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
GB05.02.2013
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2014/07]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
IE05.02.2013
FR28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/42]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
MC28.02.2013
Former [2013/33]AT28.03.2012
BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
DK28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
IT28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NL28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
BG28.06.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
ES09.07.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2013/01]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
PT30.07.2012
Former [2012/50]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
SK28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
Former [2012/49]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
CZ28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
PL28.03.2012
RO28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
SI28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
IS28.07.2012
Former [2012/48]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
EE28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
SE28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/46]BE28.03.2012
CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/41]CY28.03.2012
FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/39]FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
LV28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/37]FI28.03.2012
HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/36]HR28.03.2012
LT28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
GR29.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT28.03.2012
NO28.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]  - MCCOWAN I A ET AL, "Robust speech recognition using near-field superdirective beamforming with post-filtering", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 2000. ICASSP '00. PROCEEDING S. 2000 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON 5-9 JUNE 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20000605), vol. 3, ISBN 978-0-7803-6293-2, pages 1723 - 1726, XP010507691 [A] 1-14 * abstract * * page 1724, paragraph [2.3 Post-filter] * * figure 2 *
 [A]  - MEYER J ET AL, "Multi-channel speech enhancement in a car environment using Wiener filtering and spectral subtraction", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1997. ICASSP-97., 1997 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MUNICH, GERMANY 21-24 APRIL 1997, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, (19970421), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-8186-7919-3, pages 1167 - 1170, XP010226007 [A] 1,8 * abstract * * pages 1168-1169, paragraph [3. Algorithm] * * figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1997.596150
 [A]  - LEUKIMMIATIS STAMATIS ET AL, "An optimum microphone array post-filter for speech applications", INTERSPEECH INTL. CONF. SPOKEN LANG. PROC., INTERSPEECH ICSLP; INTERSPEECH 2006 AND 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING, INTERSPEECH 2006 - ICSLP; INTERSPEECH 2006 AND 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SPOKEN LANGUAGE PROCESSING,, (2006), vol. 5, pages 2142 - 2145, XP002489289 [A] 1,8 * abstract * * pages 2143-2144, par. [3.2. Proposed Generalized Post-Filter] * * figure 1 *