Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2131704

EP2131704 - DEVICE FOR PREPARING A LIQUID BEVERAGE FROM A CARTRIDGE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.10.2010
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.10.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
15.10.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Société des Produits Nestlé S.A.
Entre-deux-Villes
1800 Vevey / CH
[2019/28]
Former [2017/42]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Former [2009/51]For all designated states
Nestec S.A.
Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Inventor(s)01 / DENISART, Jean-Luc
Ch. du Vigny 2
CH-1096 Cully / CH
02 / MEIER, Alain
Casa Galli
CH-6837 Caneggio / CH
03 / BONACCI, Enzo
Ch. Grammont 6
CH-1073 Savigny / CH
04 / PLEISCH, HansPeter
Ch. Entre deux villes 2
CH-1802 Corseaux / CH
05 / TALON, Christian
Chemin des Vignes 22C
CH-1134 Vufflens-le-château / CH
 [2009/51]
Representative(s)Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2011/50]Rupp, Christian
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2009/51]Borne, Patrice Daniel
Nestec S.A. Avenue Nestlé 55
1800 Vevey / CH
Application number, filing date08709016.315.02.2008
[2009/51]
WO2008EP51828
Priority number, dateEP2007010361006.03.2007         Original published format: EP 07103610
[2009/51]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008107281
Date:12.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2131704
Date:16.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008
[2009/51]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2131704
Date:24.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP30.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:A47J31/06, A47J31/40
[2009/51]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/51]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIGEN LEBENSMITTELS AUS EINER KAPSEL[2016/29]
English:DEVICE FOR PREPARING A LIQUID BEVERAGE FROM A CARTRIDGE[2009/51]
French:DISPOSITIF POUR PRÉPARER UNE BOISSON LIQUIDE À PARTIR D'UNE CARTOUCHE[2009/51]
Former [2009/51]VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FLÜSSIGEN GETRÄNKS AUS EINER PATRONE
Entry into regional phase06.10.2009National basic fee paid 
06.10.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
06.10.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.10.2009Examination requested  [2009/51]
19.11.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.09.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2010Fee for grant paid
06.10.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Grey, Ian Michael
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Opponent's representative
Grey, Ian Michael, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 02  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Patentwerk B.V.
Julianaplein 4
5211 BC 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Opponent's representative
Patentwerk B.V., et al
P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
 03  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Schramm, Michael / Schneider, Günther
Cuvilliesstr 14a
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
2s-ip Schramm Schneider Bertagnoll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Part mbB
Postfach 86 02 67
81629 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/04]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Grey, Ian Michael
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Opponent's representative
Grey, Ian Michael, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
 02  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Patentwerk B.V.
Julianaplein 4
5211 BC 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Opponent's representative
Patentwerk B.V., et al
P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
 03  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Schramm, Michael / Schneider, Günther
Cuvilliesstr 14a
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
2s | ip Schramm Schneider Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 86 02 67
81629 München / DE
Former [2011/46]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Grey, Ian Michael
Venner Shipley LLP
20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Opponent's representative
Grey, Ian Michael, et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
 02  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Patentwerk B.V.
Julianaplein 4
5211 BC 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Opponent's representative
Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman, et al
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
 03  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Schramm, Michael / Schneider, Günther
Cuvilliesstr 14a
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Bettinger Schneider Schramm
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Cuvilliésstraße 14a
81679 München / DE
Former [2011/40]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Grey, Ian Michael
Venner Shipley LLP
20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Opponent's representative
Grey, Ian Michael, et al
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
 02  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Patentwerk B.V.
Julianaplein 4
5211 BC 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Opponent's representative
Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman, et al
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
 03  24.08.2011  30.08.2011  ADMISSIBLE
Schramm Michael
Cuvilliesstr 14a
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Schneider, Günther Martin
Bettinger Schneider Schramm Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 02 67
81629 München / DE
Former [2011/39]
Opponent(s)01  23.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Grey, Ian Michael
Venner Shipley LLP
20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
Opponent's representative
Grey, Ian Michael
Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain
London EC1A 7DH / GB
 02  24.08.2011    ADMISSIBLE
Patentwerk B.V.
Julianaplein 4
5211 BC 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
Opponent's representative
Langenhuijsen, Bastiaan Wilhelmus Herman
Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514
5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL
 03  24.08.2011   
Schramm Michael
Cuvilliesstr 14a
81679 München / DE
Opponent's representative
Schneider, Günther Martin
Bettinger Schneider Schramm
Cuvilliesstrasse 14a
81679 München / DE
28.09.2011Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.03.2012Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.12.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.05.2016Date of oral proceedings
30.09.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.09.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition21.10.2016Appeal received No.  T2475/16
09.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
30.11.2016Appeal received No.  T2475/16
07.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
LU15.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
IS24.03.2011
HR15.02.2018
SI16.02.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2018/52]CY24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
LU15.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
IS24.03.2011
SI16.02.2018
Former [2015/22]CY24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
MT24.11.2010
LU15.02.2011
MC28.02.2011
IS24.03.2011
Former [2011/38]CY24.11.2010
EE24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
IS24.03.2011
Former [2011/29]CY24.11.2010
LT24.11.2010
LV24.11.2010
IS24.03.2011
Cited inInternational search[X]EP1486150  (HALE ROBERT [CA]) [X] 1-4,7-9,11,12,14,19,21 * paragraphs [0021] - [0032] - [50.51]; figures 1-5 *;
 [XA]US3260190  (LEVINSON DAVID J) [X] 1,10,11,14,15,19 * column 3, line 3 - column 5, line 71; figures 1-4,9 * [A] 5-7;
 [XA]US3470812  (LEVINSON DAVID J) [X] 1,11,15 * column 3, line 1 - column 4, line 9; figures 1,3,6-8 * [A] 4,7;
 [X]US2002144604  (WINKLER KARL T [US], et al) [X] 21 * paragraphs [0021] - [0025]; figures 1,5-7 *;
 [A]FR2842089  (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 20,21 * page 8, lines 6-18,25-31 * * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 14 * * page 12, line 29 - page 14, line 3 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1669011  (SAECO INTERNAT GROUP S P A [IT]) [A] 21 * paragraphs [0016] - [0018] - [0022] , [0023] , [0026] - [0029] - [0033] - [0039]; figures 1-3 *