Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2121876

EP2121876 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PARAFFINIC HYDROCARBONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.04.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
05.04.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
[2018/13]
Former [2009/48]For all designated states
Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V.
Carel Van Bylandtlaan 30
2596 HR The Hague / NL
Inventor(s)01 / VAN HEUZEN, Auke, Antoinette
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / DE LANG, Hans
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
03 / MOUREAUX, Patrick
Route Departementale 3
F-76650 Petit-Couronne / FR
04 / REINALDA, Donald
c/o Shell Techn. India Pvt Ltd
Global Solutions Division
Innovation & Research AP IN Dpt.
RMZ Centennial Campus B 8B, Kundanahalli Main Road
Bangalore 560048 / IN
05 / RIGUTTO, Marcello, Stafano
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
 [2013/08]
Former [2010/07]01 / VAN HEUZEN, Auke, Antoinette
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / DE LANG, Hans
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
03 / MOUREAUX, Patrick
Route Departementale 3
F-76650 Petit-Couronne / FR
04 / REINALDA, Donald
c/o Shell Techn. India Pvt Ltd Global Solutions Division Innovation & Research AP IN Dpt. RMZ Centennial Campus B 8B Kundanahalli Main Road
Bangalore 560048 / IN
05 / RIGUTTO, Marcello, Stafano
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
Former [2009/48]01 / VAN HEUZEN, Auke, Antoinette
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
02 / DE LANG, Hans
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
03 / MOUREAUX, Patrick
Route Departementale 3
F-76650 Petit-Couronne / FR
04 / REINALDA, Donald
Badhuisweg 3
1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
05 / RIGUTTO, Marcello, Stafano
Badhuisweg 3
NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL
Representative(s)Shell Legal Services IP
p/a Carel van Bylandtlaan 16
2596 HR Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2013/08]Matthezing, Robert Maarten
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384
2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Former [2009/48]Matthezing, Robert Maarten
Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384
NL-2501 CJ The Hague / NL
Application number, filing date08709121.120.02.2008
[2009/48]
WO2008EP52039
Priority number, dateEP2007010272520.02.2007         Original published format: EP 07102725
[2009/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008101945
Date:28.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2121876
Date:25.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008
[2009/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2121876
Date:20.02.2013
Language:EN
[2013/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/08, C10G3/00, C11C3/12
[2012/36]
Former International [2009/48]C10L1/08
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/48]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG PARAFFINISCHER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE[2012/36]
English:PROCESS FOR PRODUCING PARAFFINIC HYDROCARBONS[2009/48]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR LA PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES PARAFFINIQUES[2012/36]
Former [2009/48]VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG PARAFFINIERTER KOHLENWASSERSTOFFE
Former [2009/48]PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'HYDROCARBURES PARAFFINIQUES
Entry into regional phase06.08.2009National basic fee paid 
06.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
06.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure06.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/48]
31.08.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2012Fee for grant paid
28.12.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2012
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  19.11.2013  09.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Gudat, Axel
Zehntweg 48
51467 Bergish Gladbach / DE
 02  20.11.2013  09.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Haldor Topsoe A/S
Nymollevej 55, P.O.Box 213
DK-2800 Lyngby / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2016/14]
Opponent(s)01  19.11.2013  09.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Gudat, Axel
Zehntweg 48
51467 Bergish Gladbach / DE
 02  20.11.2013  09.12.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Haldor Topsoe A/S
Nymollevej 55, P.O.Box 213
DK-2800 Lyngby / DK
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2014/01]
Opponent(s)01  19.11.2013   
Gudat, Axel
Zehntweg 48
51467 Bergish Gladbach / DE
 02  20.11.2013   
Haldor Topsoe A/S
Nymollevej 55, P.O.Box 213
DK-2800 Lyngby / DK
Opponent's representative
Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser, et al
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Former [2013/52]
Opponent(s)01  19.11.2013   
Gudat, Axel
Zehntweg 48
51467 Bergish Gladbach / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
15.01.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
11.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
06.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
30.11.2015Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
Appeal following opposition28.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0170/16
07.04.2016Statement of grounds filed
25.01.2016Appeal received No.  T0170/16
29.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
24.03.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
01.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.02.2008
AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
IE20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LU20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
[2015/34]
Former [2015/32]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
IE20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
TR20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/32]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
IE20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
MT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/07]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
IE20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2014/03]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
IT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/52]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CY20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/49]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
CZ20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
RO20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
SK20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/48]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
DK20.02.2013
EE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
CH28.02.2013
LI28.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/42]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
MC28.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/41]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
HR20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/40]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
PT20.06.2013
Former [2013/38]AT20.02.2013
BE20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
LV20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/37]AT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
SI20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
GR21.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/36]AT20.02.2013
LT20.02.2013
PL20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
ES31.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/34]LT20.02.2013
BG20.05.2013
NO20.05.2013
IS20.06.2013
Former [2013/33]LT20.02.2013
NO20.05.2013
Cited inInternational search[DA]EP1396531  (FORTUM OYJ [FI] NESTE OIL OYJ [FI]) [DA] 1-13 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0020] - [0026]; claims 1-25 *;
 [DA]US5705722  (MONNIER JACQUES [CA] ET AL) [DA] 1-13 * example 1; claims 1-10 *