Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2126961

EP2126961 - METHOD TO ACCURATELY DISCRIMINATE GAS PHASE IONS WITH SEVERAL FILTERING DEVICES IN TANDEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.04.2015
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.10.2017Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG, HU, TR
published on 15.11.2017  [2017/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sociedad Europea De Analisis Diferencial De Movilidad S.L.
José Làzaro Galdiano 1
28036 Madrid / ES
[2009/49]
Inventor(s)01 / CASADO, Alejandro
Parque Tecnologico de Boecillo
parcela 205
47151 Boecillo - Valladolid / ES
02 / FERNANDEZ DE LA MORA, Gonzalo
José Lazaro Galdiano 1
28036 Madrid / ES
03 / FERNANDEZ DE LA MORA, Juan
80 Cold Spring Street
New Haven, Connecticut 06511 / US
 [2014/25]
Former [2009/49]01 / CASADO, Alejandro
Parque Tecnologico de Boecillo parcela 205
47151 Boecillo - Valladolid / ES
02 / FERNANDEZ DE LA MORA, Gonzalo
José Lazaro Galdiano 1
28036 Madrid / ES
03 / FERNANDEZ DE LA MORA, Juan
80 Cold Spring Street
New Haven, Connecticut 06511 / US
Representative(s)Temiño Ceniceros, Ignacio , et al
Abril Abogados
Amador de los Rios 1-1°
28010 Madrid / ES
[N/P]
Former [2011/17]Temino Ceniceros, Ignacio , et al
Abril Abogados Amador de los Rios 1-1°
28010 Madrid / ES
Former [2009/49]ABG Patentes, S.L.
Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor
28036 Madrid / ES
Application number, filing date08709173.221.02.2008
[2009/49]
WO2008EP52147
Priority number, dateUS20070903251P24.02.2007         Original published format: US 903251 P
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008101998
Date:28.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/35]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2126961
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.2008
[2009/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2126961
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.04.2009
ClassificationInternational:H01J49/42
[2009/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GENAUEN UNTERSCHEIDUNG VON GASPHASENIONEN MIT MEHREREN FILTEREINRICHTUNGEN IN TANDEMSCHALTUNG[2009/49]
English:METHOD TO ACCURATELY DISCRIMINATE GAS PHASE IONS WITH SEVERAL FILTERING DEVICES IN TANDEM[2009/49]
French:PROCÉDÉ POUR DISTINGUER AVEC PRÉCISION DES IONS EN PHASE GAZEUSE AU MOYEN DE PLUSIEURS DISPOSITIFS DE FILTRATION EN TANDEM[2009/49]
Entry into regional phase24.09.2009National basic fee paid 
24.09.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
24.09.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.05.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.09.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
16.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2014Fee for grant paid
30.04.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.02.2011
Opposition(s)19.03.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
07.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
22.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
14.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.02.2008
AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
BG18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
TR18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
LU21.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
[2017/39]
Former [2017/03]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
MT18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
LU21.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/47]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
LU21.02.2015
CH28.02.2015
LI28.02.2015
Former [2015/46]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
MC18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
LU21.02.2015
Former [2015/44]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
LU21.02.2015
Former [2015/36]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SI18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/30]AT18.06.2014
BE18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/22]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
DK18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
IT18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/12]AT18.06.2014
CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
NL18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
IS18.10.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/11]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
PL18.06.2014
RO18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
PT20.10.2014
Former [2015/10]CY18.06.2014
CZ18.06.2014
EE18.06.2014
ES18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
SK18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/50]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
HR18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
LV18.06.2014
SE18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
GR19.09.2014
Former [2014/49]CY18.06.2014
FI18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
NO18.09.2014
Former [2014/48]CY18.06.2014
LT18.06.2014
Former [2014/47]CY18.06.2014
Cited inInternational search[DX]US5869831  (DE LA MORA JUAN FERNANDEZ [US], et al) [DX] 1-4,7-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 14 - line 18 * * column 2, line 34 - line 36 * * column 2, line 61 - line 67 * * column 3, line 1 - line 9 * * column 5, line 20 - line 32 * * column 6, line 43 - line 48 * * column 6, line 54 - line 56 * * figures 2,4 * * claim 3 *;
 [A]US3639756  (SCHULZ HANSRICHARD) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5907154  (SHIMOMURA MANABU [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [DA]WO03041114  (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [DA] 1-14 * abstract * * claims 4,5,13,35 * * page 7, line 7 * * page 13, line 6 - line 25 *;
 [A]US2004094702  (CLEMMER DAVID E [US]) [A] 1-14 * claims 1,8 * * page 2, column 2, paragraph 16 - paragraph 18 * * page 10, column 2, line 21, paragraph 104 - line 25 * * page 16, column 1, line 30, paragraph 125 - line 36; figures 2,9,21,23 *
Examination WO2006054101
  US2003001084