Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2119267

EP2119267 - ALLOCATION OF SERVICE AREA IDENTIFIERS INDICATIVE OF LOCATION INFORMATION AND CHARGING INFORMATION FOR A FEMTO CELL IN A WIRELESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/47]A METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR ALLOCATING SERVICE AREA IDENTIFIERS IN A WIRELESS SYSTEM
[2015/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.12.2016
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.07.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU, TR
Updated state(s): MT
published on 15.08.2018  [2018/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2009/47]For all designated states
Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ)
164 83 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LINDQVIST, Thomas
Wennerbergsgatan 49
S-431 39 Mölndal / SE
02 / NYLANDER, Tomas
Högtorpsvägen 28
S-139 34 Värmdö / SE
03 / VIKBERG, Jari
Svalsätersvägen 12
S-153 38 Järna / SE
 [2009/47]
Representative(s)Ericsson
Patent Development
Torshamnsgatan 21-23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
[2016/04]
Former [2009/47]Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich
Ericsson AB Patent Unit LTE Torshamnsgatan 23
164 80 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date08712771.801.02.2008
[2009/47]
WO2008SE50131
Priority number, dateUS20070893765P08.03.2007         Original published format: US 893765 P
[2009/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008108716
Date:12.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2119267
Date:18.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008
[2009/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2119267
Date:27.01.2016
Language:EN
[2016/04]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE12.09.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W24/02, // H04W84/04
[2014/11]
Former International [2009/48]H04W4/00
Former International [2009/47]H04Q7/22, H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/04]
Former [2009/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUORDNUNG VON DIENSTBEREICHSIDENTIFIKATOREN, DIE ORTUNGS- UND VERGEBÜHRUNGSINFORMATION BEZEICHNEN, FÜR EINE FEMTO-ZELLE IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN SYSTEM[2015/41]
English:ALLOCATION OF SERVICE AREA IDENTIFIERS INDICATIVE OF LOCATION INFORMATION AND CHARGING INFORMATION FOR A FEMTO CELL IN A WIRELESS SYSTEM[2015/41]
French:ATTRIBUTION D'IDENTIFIANTS DE ZONE DE SERVICE, INDICATIFS D'INFORMATION DE LOCALISATION ET D'INFORMATION DE FACTURATION, POUR UNE FEMTO CELLULE DANS UN SYSTÈME SANS FIL[2015/41]
Former [2009/47]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZUORDNUNG VON DIENSTBEREICHSIDENTIFIKATOREN IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN SYSTEM
Former [2009/47]A METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR ALLOCATING SERVICE AREA IDENTIFIERS IN A WIRELESS SYSTEM
Former [2009/47]PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREILS POUR ATTRIBUER DES IDENTIFIANTS DE ZONE DE SERVICE DANS UN SYSTÈME SANS FIL
Entry into regional phase10.07.2009National basic fee paid 
10.07.2009Search fee paid 
10.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/47]
21.02.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.12.2015Fee for grant paid
02.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
02.12.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.02.2014
Opposition(s)28.10.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2017/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
26.02.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.02.2008
AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CY27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
TR27.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
LU01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
MT29.02.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
[2018/31]
Former [2018/28]HU01.02.2008
AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CY27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
MT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2017/47]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
MT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2017/15]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SI27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
BG27.04.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
IE01.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2017/03]AT27.01.2016
BE27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/50]AT27.01.2016
CZ27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
RO27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
SK27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/49]AT27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
EE27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
MC27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/46]AT27.01.2016
DK27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
CH29.02.2016
LI29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
LV27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
SE27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/38]AT27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
IS27.05.2016
PT27.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT27.01.2016
ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
IT27.01.2016
LT27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
PL27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
Former [2016/35]ES27.01.2016
FI27.01.2016
HR27.01.2016
NL27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
NO27.04.2016
GR28.04.2016
Former [2016/30]NL27.01.2016
BE29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]BE29.02.2016
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2005015917  (IBIS TELECOM INC [US]; SCHEINERT STEFAN [US]; LANGE PETER [AU]) [I] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraphs [0021] - [0026] - [0 32] - [0033] - [0 50] - [0067] * * paragraphs [0073] - [0077] - [0 11] - [0121] - [ 125] - [0127] *;
 [A]US2004198386  (DUPRAY DENNIS J [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0393] - paragraph [0399] * * paragraphs [0643] - [0647] *;
 [IP]WO2007040453  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [IP] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0062] *;
 [E]WO2008047039  (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]; BERNARD EMMANUELLE [FR]; BUNOUT EMMANUELLE [FR];) [E] 1-24 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 7, paragraph last * * page 8, paragraph last - page 11, paragraph 3 * * page 13, paragraph 3 - page 22, paragraph 1 *
International search[A]WO0152569  (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al);
 [A]WO2005086421  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al);
 [A]GB2369002  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]);
 [A]WO0141494  (ERICSSON INC [US]);
 [P]US2007105527  (NYLANDER TOMAS [SE], et al);
 [P]US2007097939  (NYLANDER TOMAS [SE], et al);
 [P]WO2007040449  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]);
 [P]WO2007117184  (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al)
by applicantWO2007136339