blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2103200

EP2103200 - COLD WORKED METAL HOUSING FOR A PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.03.2018
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  21.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  12.12.2016
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip26.06.2020Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 29.07.2020  [2020/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
APPLE INC.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2017/21]
Former [2009/39]For all designated states
Apple Inc.
1 Infinite Loop
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ZADESKY, Stephen P.
363 La Cuesta Drive
Portola Valley, California 94028 / US
02 / HOBSON, Philip M.
315 Central Avenue
Menlo Park, California 94025 / US
03 / TAN, Tang Yew
549 Kansas Street
San Francisco, California 94107 / US
 [2009/39]
Representative(s)Rooney, John-Paul, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
2 London Bridge
London SE1 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2017/21]Rooney, John-Paul, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
Former [2011/24]Rooney, John-Paul, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2009/39]Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date08713045.604.01.2008
[2009/39]
WO2008US00212
Priority number, dateUS2007065006805.01.2007         Original published format: US 650068
[2009/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008085949
Date:17.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/29]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2103200
Date:23.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2103200
Date:24.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.06.2009
ClassificationIPC:H05K5/02, H04M1/02
[2016/51]
CPC:
H04M1/0252 (EP,KR,US); H05K5/0213 (KR); H05K5/0217 (US);
H05K5/0013 (EP,US); H05K5/0018 (KR); H05K5/0243 (KR);
Y10T29/18 (EP,US); Y10T29/477 (EP,US); Y10T29/49826 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/39]H05K5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/21]
Former [2009/39]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:KALTGEWALZTES METALLGEHÄUSE FÜR EINE TRAGBARE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG[2009/39]
English:COLD WORKED METAL HOUSING FOR A PORTABLE ELECTRONIC DEVICE[2009/39]
French:BOÎTIER MÉTALLIQUE TRAVAILLÉ À FROID POUR DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE PORTABLE[2009/39]
Entry into regional phase07.07.2009National basic fee paid 
07.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
07.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
15.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.04.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.08.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.12.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2017Fee for grant paid
13.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
13.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP12198611.1  / EP2579698
EP18179408.2  / EP3399849
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.12.2010
Opposition(s)27.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
11.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
13.01.2015Renewal fee patent year 08
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 09
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.01.2008
AT24.05.2017
CY24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
PT24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
TR24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
IE04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
MT04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2020/31]
Former [2020/27]HU04.01.2008
AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
PT24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
TR24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
IE04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
MT04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2020/15]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
TR24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
IE04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
MT04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2020/08]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
IE04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
MT04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2019/30]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
MC24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
IE04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2019/09]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
IE04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
GB04.01.2018
LU04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
LU04.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
FR31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
LU04.01.2018
Former [2018/25]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SI24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/11]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
IT24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
PL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT24.05.2017
CZ24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
RO24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
SK24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2018/09]AT24.05.2017
DK24.05.2017
EE24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/52]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
NL24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
LV24.05.2017
SE24.05.2017
BG24.08.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT24.05.2017
ES24.05.2017
FI24.05.2017
HR24.05.2017
LT24.05.2017
NO24.08.2017
GR25.08.2017
IS24.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[X]US5822192  (HAYASHI YOSHIAKI [JP]) [X] 35-41 * column 3, line 33 - column 5, line 31; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]US5960332  (MICHALZIK DIRK [DE]) [A] 1-45* column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 60; figures 3a-3e *;
 [X]US6031524  (KUNERT STEVEN R [US]) [X] 42-45 * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 10; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]JP2001203478  (YAZAKI CORP) [X] 17-24 * abstract * * figures 1,4,6,9 *;
 [A]EP1130879  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC TELECOM EU [FR]) [A] 1-45 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0028]; figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US2001024945  (INOMATA YOJI [JP], et al) [X] 42-45 * paragraph [0055]; figures 1,3 *;
 [X]US2004102208  (NUOVO FRANK [US], et al) [X] 25-28,42-45 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,4 * * paragraph [0045] *;
 [X]US2004203518  (ZHENG FEI [CN], et al) [X] 1-16,29-34 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021]; figure 1 *
ExaminationJP2003131198
by applicantUS5822192
 US6031524
 US2001024945
 US2004102208
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.