Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2125883

EP2125883 - REGULATORY T CELL EPITOPES, COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.08.2011
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
22.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Epivax, Inc.
146 Clifford Street
Providence, RI 02903 / US
[2009/49]
Inventor(s)01 / DE GROOT, Anne
292 Morris Avenue
Providence, RI 02906 / US
02 / MARTIN, William
3650 Diamond Hill Road
Cumberland, RI 02864 / US
03 / RIVERA, Dan
304 Pearl Street
Providence, RI 02907 / US
 [2009/49]
Representative(s)Cooley (UK) LLP
Dashwood
69 Old Broad Street
London EC2M 1QS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
Former [2010/51]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Former [2009/49]Murphy, Colm Damien , et al
Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London
SW11 1BP / GB
Application number, filing date08713321.129.01.2008
[2009/49]
WO2008US01148
Priority number, dateUS20070898347P30.01.2007         Original published format: US 898347 P
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008094538
Date:07.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2125883
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008
[2009/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2125883
Date:21.09.2011
Language:EN
[2011/38]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP2125883
Date:23.04.2014
[2014/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.02.2009
ClassificationInternational:C07K14/47
[2009/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:EPITOPE VON REGULATORISCHEN T ZELLEN UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN[2014/46]
English:REGULATORY T CELL EPITOPES, COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF[2009/49]
French:ÉPITOPES DE LYMPHOCYTES T RÉGULATEURS, COMPOSITIONS ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI[2009/49]
Former [2009/49]REGULATORISCHE T-ZELLEN-EPITOPEN SOWIE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN DAMIT UND ANWENDUNGEN DAVON
Entry into regional phase20.08.2009National basic fee paid 
20.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
20.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
01.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.04.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.08.2011Fee for grant paid
05.08.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP11177609.2  / EP2423219
EP11177625.8  / EP2423220
EP11177630.8  / EP2423221
EP11177634.0  / EP2423222
EP12153164.4  / EP2450366
EP12153166.9  / EP2450367
EP12153170.1  / EP2450368
EP12153171.9  / EP2450369
EP12153173.5  / EP2450370
EP12153174.3  / EP2450371
EP12153177.6  / EP2450372
EP15153373.4  / EP2896630
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
 [N/P]
Former [2016/09]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
Strawman Limited
Orchard Lea
Horns Lane
Combe, Witney
Oxfordshire OX29 8NH / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2015/34]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2012  28.06.2012  ADMISSIBLE
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
D Young & Co LLP, et al
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
Former [2012/30]
Opponent(s)01  20.06.2012   
STRAWMAN LIMITED
34 Lovedon Lane Winchester
Hampshire, SO23 7NU / GB
Opponent's representative
Harding, Charles Thomas, et al
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
GB-London EC1N 2DY / GB
26.07.2012Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
05.04.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
01.10.2014Date of oral proceedings
25.11.2014Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
25.11.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition23.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0151/15
31.03.2015Statement of grounds filed
21.08.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2015/34]
17.12.2015Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2015/51]
18.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU29.01.2008
AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE29.01.2012
LU29.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/27]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE29.01.2012
LU29.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2014/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
TR21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE29.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/35]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
MT21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE29.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2013/29]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
DK21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
BG21.12.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
ES01.01.2012
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
IE29.01.2012
CH31.01.2012
LI31.01.2012
MC31.01.2012
Former [2012/26]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
PL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/23]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
EE21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
IT21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
NL21.09.2011
RO21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
SK21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
PT23.01.2012
Former [2012/21]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
CZ21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
IS21.01.2012
Former [2012/18]AT21.09.2011
BE21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
Former [2012/13]AT21.09.2011
CY21.09.2011
FI21.09.2011
HR21.09.2011
LT21.09.2011
LV21.09.2011
SE21.09.2011
SI21.09.2011
NO21.12.2011
GR22.12.2011
Cited inInternational search[A]EP1803732  (CT INGENIERIA GENETICA BIOTECH [CU]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006082406  (ANTITOPE LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 3 - page 4 *
 [T]  - DE GROOT ET AL., "Activation of natural regulatory T cells by IgG Fc-derived peptide "Tregitopes"", BLOOD, ISSN 1528-0020, (20080725), (20080917), XP002496382 [T] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2008-02-138073
 [A]  - DURINOVIC-BELLO IVANA ET AL, "DRB1*0401-restricted human T cell clone specific for the major proinsulin73-90 epitope expresses a down-regulatory T helper 2 phenotype", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (200608), vol. 103, no. 31, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11683 - 11688, XP002496383 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0603682103
 [A]  - KAMPHUIS S ET AL, "Tolerogenic immune responses to novel T-cell epitopes from heat-shock protein 60 in juvenile idiopathic arthritis", LANCET, LITTLE, BROWM AND CO., BOSTON, US, (20050702), vol. 366, no. 9479, ISSN 0099-5355, pages 50 - 56, XP002371481 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0140-6736(05)66827-4
 [A]  - LANZA PAOLA ET AL, "Enhancement of regulatory T cells (Treg) function by epitope specific immunotherapy leads to clinical control of experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis (EAE)", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, & ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN-ASSOCIATION-OF-IMMUNOLOGISTS; BOSTON, MA, USA; MAY 12 -16, 2006, (200604), vol. 176, no. Suppl. S, ISSN 0022-1767, page S150, XP009105926 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LI SHUO ET AL, "Defining target antigens for CD25(+)FOXP3(+)IFN-gamma(-) regulatory T cells in chronic hepatitis C virus infection", IMMUNOLOGY AND CELL BIOLOGY, (20070102), vol. 85, no. 3, ISSN 0818-9641, pages 197 - 204, XP009105932 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *
 [A]  - MACDONALD A J ET AL, "CD4 T HELPER TYPE 1 AND REGULATORY T CELLS INDUCED AGAINST THE SAME EPITOPES ON THE CORE PROTEIN IN HEPATITIS C VIRUS-INFECTED PERSONS", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES, CHICAGO, IL, (20020315), vol. 185, no. 6, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 720 - 727, XP009036233 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/339340
 [A]  - SUMIDA TAKAYUKI ET AL, "Regulatory T cell epitope recognized by T cells from labial salivary glands of patients with Sjogren's syndrome", ARTHRITIS AND RHEUMATISM, & 61ST NATIONAL SCIENTIFIC MEETING OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF RHEUMATOLOGY AND THE 32ND NATIONAL SCIEN; WASHINGTON, DC, USA; NOVEMBER 8-12, 1997, (199709), vol. 40, no. 9 SUPPL., ISSN 0004-3591, page S225, XP002496386 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/art.1780401225
 [A]  - HALL ANDREW M ET AL, "Interleukin-10-mediated regulatory T-cell responses to epitopes on a human red blood cell autoantigen.", BLOOD, (20021215), vol. 100, no. 13, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4529 - 4536, XP002496387 [A] 1-23 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2002-05-1383
by applicantUS5328470
 US4522811
    - SHEVACH, E., NAT. REV. LMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 2, pages 389 - 400
    - LEI, T. ET AL., CELL. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 235, pages 12 - 20
    - BAXEVANIS, C. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1986), vol. 16, pages 1013 - 1016
    - RAVETCH, J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 234, pages 718 - 725
    - PEARSE, R, IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 10, pages 753 - 760
    - JOSHI, T. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 43, pages 839 - 850
    - DE GROOT, A. ET AL., AIDS RES. HUM. RETROVIRUSES, (1997), vol. 13, pages 539 - 541
    - SCHAFER, J. ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 1880 - 1884
    - DE GROOT, A. ET AL., VACCINE, (2001), vol. 19, pages 4385 - 95
    - DE GROOT, A. ET AL., VACCINE, (2003), vol. 21, pages 4486 - 504
    - BOWIE, J. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 247, pages 1306 - 1310
    - CHEN ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1994), vol. 91, pages 3054 - 3057
    - NOVAK, E. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, pages 6665 - 6670
    - ZHAO, Y. ET AL., J. IMMUNOTHER., (2006), vol. 29, pages 398 - 406
    - RUITENBERG, J. ET AL., BMC IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 7, page 11
    - DE GROOT, A ET AL., AIDS RES. HUM. RETROVIRUSES, (1997), vol. 13, pages 539 - 541
    - STURNIOLO, T. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (1999), vol. 17, pages 555 - 561
    - CURRIER, J. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2002), vol. 260, pages 157 - 72
    - MWAU, M. ET AL., AIDS RES. HUM. RETROVIRUSES, (2002), vol. 18, pages 611 - 8
    - HUDGENS, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 288, pages 19 - 34
    - MAILLERE, B. ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 32, pages 1377 - 85
    - ALLEN, P. ET AL., INT. IMMUNOL., (1989), vol. 1, pages 141 - 50
    - AHLERS, J. ET AL., J. CLIN. INVEST., (2001), vol. 108, pages 1677 - 1685
    - BISCHOF, F. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20011002), vol. 98, pages 12168 - 73
    - COBBOLD, S. ET AL., IMMUNOL REV., (2006), vol. 213, pages 239 - 55
    - D'AMBROSIO, D. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, pages 5111 - 5
    - DE GROOT, A.; BERZOFSKY, J., METHODS, (2004), vol. 34, pages 425 - 428
    - DE GROOT, A. ET AL., IMMUNOL. CELL BIOL., (2002), vol. 80, pages 255 - 269
    - DURINOVIC-BELLO, I. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 11683 - 11688
    - EI-AMINE, M. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 165, pages 5631 - 5636
    - EI-AMINE, M, INT. IMMUNOL.,, (2002), vol. 14, pages 761 - 766
    - FENG, I. ET AL., J BIOMED SCI., (2006), vol. 14, pages 43 - 57
    - HJELM, F. ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNO/., (2006), vol. 64, pages 177 - 184
    - HOCHWELLER, K. ET AL., CURR. MO/. MED., (2006), vol. 6, pages 631 - 43
    - HUANG, X. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 175, pages 4283 - 4291
    - JORDAN, S. ET AL., AM. J. TRANSPLANT., (2006), vol. 6, pages 459 - 66
    - KARLSSON M. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1999), vol. 96, pages 2244 - 2249
    - KLEE, L.; ZAND, R., NEUROINFORMATICS, (2004), vol. 2, pages 59 - 70
    - MONNEAUX, F. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 175, pages 5839 - 5847
    - MUDD, P. ET AL., SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 64, pages 211 - 8
    - NAGATA, K. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, pages 1278 - 86
    - NGUYEN, V. ET AL., BIOL. BLOOD MARROW TRANSPLANT, (2006), vol. 12, pages 995 - 1009
    - PHILLIPS, W. ET AL., INT. REV. IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 24, pages 501 - 17
    - REIJONEN, H.; KWOK W., METHODS, (2003), vol. 29, pages 282 - 288
    - REITAN, S.; HANNESTAD, K., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2002), vol. 99, pages 7588 - 7593
    - SHEVACH, E. ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2006), vol. 212, pages 60 - 73
    - SHIOJI, K. ET AL., CIRC. RES., (2001), vol. 89, pages 540 - 546
    - SOUTHWOOD, S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, pages 3363 - 3373
    - ST. CLAIR, E. ET AL., ANNU. REV. MED., (2006), vol. 58, pages 329 - 346
    - STOCK, P ET AL., CURR. OPIN. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 6, pages 12 - 16
    - SUMIDA, T. ET AL., ARTHRITIS RHEUM., (1997), vol. 40, pages 2271 - 2273
    - TANG, Q.; BLUESTONE, J., LMMUNOL. REV., (2006), vol. 212, pages 217 - 37
    - WING, K.; SAKAGUCHI, S., CURR. OPIN. ALLERGY CLIN. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 6, pages 482 - 488
    - WOHLLEBEN, G.; ERB, K., CURR. PHARM. DES., (2006), vol. 12, pages 3281 - 92
    - ZAMBIDIS, E.; SCOTT, D., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1996), vol. 93, pages 5019 - 5024